EP2754319 - ACCESS POINT SELECTION BASED ON BACKHAUL MEASUREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2014/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SRIDHARA, Vinay 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
DAS, Saumitra Mohan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2014/29] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2014/29] | Application number, filing date | 12759614.6 | 10.09.2012 | WO2012US54392 | Priority number, date | US201161532761P | 09.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161532761 P | US201213397937 | 16.02.2012 Original published format: US201213397937 | [2014/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013036906 | Date: | 14.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2754319 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/20, H04W88/08, H04W92/04 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
H04W48/20 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (EP,US);
H04W92/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/29] | Title | German: | ZUGANGSPUNKTAUSWAHL AUF BASIS VON BACKHAUL MESSUNGEN | [2014/29] | English: | ACCESS POINT SELECTION BASED ON BACKHAUL MEASUREMENTS | [2014/29] | French: | SÉLECTION DE POINTS D'ACCÈS BASÉE SUR DES MESURES DE LIAISON TERRESTRE | [2014/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 17.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/45] | 28.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2006138122 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,12,22,33 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0034] * * figure 4 * [I] 43; | [A]GB2452794 (VODAFONE PLC [GB]) [A] 1,12,22,33,43* abstract *; | [XI]US2009264123 (AGASHE PARAG A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,11-15,21-25,32-36,42 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0132] * * figures 1,5,7,9 * [I] 5-10,16-20,26-31,37-41,43-46 |