EP2895576 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECYCLING PLASTIC WASTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Outotec (Finland) Oy Rauhalanpuisto 9 02230 Espoo / FI | [2015/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAAF, Tanja Hildegard-von-Bingen Weg 7 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
BINDER, Christian Neuhofstraße 34 60318 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 03 /
ANASTASIJEVIC, Nikola Zum Niddersteg 11 63674 Altenstadt / DE | 04 /
SCHNEIDER, Günter Ziegelhüttenstrasse 19 64653 Lorsch / DE | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/33] | Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstrasse 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2015/30] | Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 12759701.1 | 14.09.2012 | [2016/33] | WO2012EP68093 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014040634 | Date: | 20.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2895576 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2895576 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C10G1/10, C10B53/07, C10B49/16, C07C4/22, C08J11/12, C10B1/10, C10K1/02 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
C10K1/028 (EP);
C08J11/12 (EP);
C10B49/16 (EP);
C10B53/07 (EP);
C10G1/086 (EP);
C10G1/10 (EP);
C10K1/026 (EP);
C10B1/10 (EP);
Y02P20/129 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR WIEDERVERWERTUNG VON KUNSTSTOFFABFÄLLEN | [2015/30] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECYCLING PLASTIC WASTES | [2015/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RECYCLAGE DES DÉCHETS PLASTIQUES | [2015/30] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 19.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.09.2012 | AL | 17.08.2016 | AT | 17.08.2016 | BE | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | CZ | 17.08.2016 | DK | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | ES | 17.08.2016 | HR | 17.08.2016 | IS | 17.08.2016 | LT | 17.08.2016 | LV | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | MK | 17.08.2016 | NL | 17.08.2016 | PL | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | RS | 17.08.2016 | SI | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | SM | 17.08.2016 | TR | 17.08.2016 | IE | 14.09.2016 | LU | 14.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | MT | 30.09.2016 | FR | 17.10.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | NO | 17.11.2016 | GR | 18.11.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 14.09.2012 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
LU | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 14.09.2012 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
LU | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 14.09.2012 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
LU | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
LU | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | LT | 17.08.2016 | |
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 17.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4584421 (SAITO KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,6-9,12-15 * figures 1,2 * * tables 1,2 * * column 5, line 50 - column 9, line 10 * * claims 5-17 * [I] 2,3,5,10,11; | [XI]US2007173673 (FUJIMOTO KAORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-9,11-15 * figures 1-32 * * paragraphs [0016] , [0025] , [0026] , [0241] - [0247] * * example - * * table 5 * * claims 1-18 * [I] 2,3,10; | [XI]EP0687692 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,5-10,12-15 * figure 1 * * page 3, line 37 - page 4, line 55 * * claims 1-12 * * example 9 * [I] 3,4,11; | [X]JPH1192590 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 9-15 * paragraphs [0023] , [0027] , [0028] , [0030] , [0032] * * figures 1,3,5,7,8,10 *; | [A]JPH0971684 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0020] , [0026] - [0039] * | by applicant | WO8802284 | DE10031643 | US7626062 | DE19928645 | US2010133085 | EP0649827 | JP2005314315 | US5335786 | - N. MISKOLCZY; L. BARTHA; GY. DEAK; B. J6VER, "Chemical recycling of waste polyethylene and polypropylene", PETROLEUM AND COAL, vol. 45, no. 3-4, pages 125 - 130 |