|
21.06.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.07.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.07.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2016 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2016 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.06.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2015 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.01.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.10.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2014 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
08.09.2014 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.09.2014 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
08.09.2014 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.09.2014 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.09.2014 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.06.2014 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2014 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.05.2014 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
20.05.2014 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
20.05.2014 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
20.05.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.05.2014 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.05.2014 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.05.2014 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.05.2014 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.05.2014 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.05.2014 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
02.05.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
14.09.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
14.09.2012 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
14.09.2012 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
14.09.2012 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
15 |
|
14.09.2012 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |