12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
05.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
20.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
28.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
21.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
07.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
23.06.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] |
05.05.2017 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] |
21.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] |
07.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] |
24.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
10.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
27.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
15.07.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
13.07.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
12.07.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.07.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
31.03.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.11.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] |
01.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.08.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.06.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
19.06.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
26.03.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.03.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
21.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.06.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.04.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|