EP2690706 - ANTENNA DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harada Industry Co., Ltd. Omori Bellport B-4F 26-2, Minami-Ohi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0013 / JP | [2014/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEKO, Kiyokazu c/o HARADA INDUSTRY CO. LTD. Omori Bellport B-4F 26-2 Minamiohi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0013 / JP | [2014/05] | Representative(s) | Moore, Graeme Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | Moore, Graeme Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12760285.2 | 30.01.2012 | WO2012JP51955 | Priority number, date | JP20110066359 | 24.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011066359 | [2014/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012127903 | Date: | 27.09.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2690706 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/32, H01Q1/42 | [2014/05] | CPC: |
H01Q1/3275 (EP,GB,US);
H01Q1/24 (US);
H01Q1/27 (US);
H01Q1/32 (US);
H01Q1/42 (EP,GB,US);
H01Q1/48 (GB);
H01Q23/00 (GB)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Title | German: | ANTENNENVORRICHTUNG | [2014/05] | English: | ANTENNA DEVICE | [2014/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF CONSTITUANT UNE ANTENNE | [2014/05] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2013 | Translation filed | 08.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/05] | 03.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/03] | Divisional application(s) | EP13192596.8 / EP2701235 | EP13192598.4 / EP2712023 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1411585 (CALEARO S R L [IT]) [A] 1 * figures 1,5,6,7 * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] ** paragraph [0036] *; | [A]DE102008042811 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] *; | [A]DE102008043632 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0017] *; | [ID]US2010265147 (WAKUI MASASHI [JP], et al) [ID] 1-5 * figures 1-7,27 * * paragraph [0151] - paragraph [0155] * * paragraph [0167] * | International search | [A]JP2003017916 (NIPPON ANTENNA KK); | [A]WO2008062746 (NIPPON ANTENNA KK [JP], et al); | [A]JP2010021856 (NIPPON ANTENNA KK) | by applicant | JP2010021856 |