EP2690876 - HETEROGENEOUS NETWORK-BASED LINKED BROADCAST CONTENT TRANSMITTING/RECEIVING DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute 161 Gajeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon-si 305-700 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | For all designated states Electronics And Telecommunications Research Institute 161 Gajeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon-si 305-700 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWON, Hyoung Jin 103-1502 Samilwonang Apt. Gagyeong-dong Heungdeok-gu Cheongju-si Chungbuk 361-741 / KR | 02 /
YUN, Kug Jin 106-1504 Songnimmaeul Apt. Hagi-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-759 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Gwang Soon 208-303 Hanseung Mimade Apt. Gyochon-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-747 / KR | 04 /
CHEONG, Won Sik 208-1101 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | 05 /
HUR, Nam Ho 801-1001 Yeolmaemaeul Apt. Noeun-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-768 / KR | [2014/05] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | Betten & Resch Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12760647.3 | 22.03.2012 | WO2012KR02057 | Priority number, date | KR20110025162 | 22.03.2011 Original published format: KR 20110025162 | KR20120029158 | 22.03.2012 Original published format: KR 20120029158 | [2014/05] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012128563 | Date: | 27.09.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2690876 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/235, H04N21/63, H04H20/33, H04N21/462, H04H20/18, H04L29/06, H04H20/93 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
H04H20/18 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (KR);
H04L65/762 (EP,US);
H04H20/65 (KR);
H04H20/93 (EP,US);
H04N21/4345 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/6125 (EP,US);
H04N21/63 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2014/05] | H04N21/235, H04N21/63, H04H20/33 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Title | German: | AUF EINEM HETEROGENEN NETZWERK BASIERENDE VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON RUNDFUNKINHALTEN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/05] | English: | HETEROGENEOUS NETWORK-BASED LINKED BROADCAST CONTENT TRANSMITTING/RECEIVING DEVICE AND METHOD | [2014/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉMISSION/RÉCEPTION DE CONTENU RADIODIFFUSÉ LIÉ GRÂCE À UN RÉSEAU HÉTÉROGÈNE | [2014/05] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2013 | Translation filed | 22.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/05] | 24.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 28.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0915621 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * figure 2 *; | [A]WO02071760 (DIGITAL INTERACTIVE BROADBAND [GB], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 9, line 10 - page 13, line 15 * * figure 1 *; | [X]FR2859859 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 2, line 16 - page 3, line 10 * * page 7, line 12 - page 11, line 14 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2007100904 (CASEY STEVEN M [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract ** paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0049]; figure 4 *; | [A]US2009094648 (PATEL NEIL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038] * * figure 1 *; | [X]US2009183207 (PATEL NEIL [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0046] * * figure 1 * | International search | [A]KR100763753B (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20090066191 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]); | [Y]KR20090091892 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | KR20080053175 |