EP2618536 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR UNIFYING FRAME RATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OU, Shuxiong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
XIANG, Hui Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Lu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
ZHAO, Liye Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
GUO, Chan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12760841.2 | 25.04.2012 | WO2012CN74662 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012126409 | Date: | 27.09.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2618536 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.04.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04J3/07, H04J3/16 | [2014/08] | CPC: |
H04J3/07 (EP,US);
H04J14/02 (US);
H04J14/0254 (EP,US);
H04J3/1652 (EP,US);
H04J14/026 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/30] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VEREINHEITLICHUNG VON BILDFREQUENZEN | [2013/30] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR UNIFYING FRAME RATES | [2013/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR UNIFIER DES FRÉQUENCES DE TRAMES | [2013/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2013 | Translation filed | 18.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 18.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2005286521 (CHIANG TING-KUANG [US], et al); | [X]US2008075113 (HARLEY JAMES [CA], et al) | International search | [A]CN1581758 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [X]CN101247200 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101848066 (ZTE CORP); | [A]CN102281477 |