EP2686449 - MULTIPLEXED DIGITAL ASSAYS WITH COMBINATORIAL USE OF SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc. 1000 Alfred Nobel Drive Hercules, CA 94547 / US | [2021/15] |
Former [2014/04] | For all designated states Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc. 1000 Alfred Nobel Drive Hercules, CA 94547 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAXONOV, Serge 5799 Balmoral Dr. Oakland, CA 94619 / US | 02 /
DUBE, Simant 4301 Lake Washington Boulevard NE Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | 03 /
HINDSON, Benjamin, J. 1039 Bannock Street Livermore, CA 94551 / US | 04 /
MCCOY, Adam, M. 1707 Van Damme Drive Davis, CA 95616 / US | [2020/26] |
Former [2014/10] | 01 /
SAXONOV, Serge 5799 Balmoral Drive Oakland, CA 94619-2439 / US | ||
02 /
DUBE, Simant 4301 Lake Washington Boulevard NE Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | |||
03 /
HINDSON, Benjamin, J. 1039 Bannock Street Livermore, CA 94551 / US | |||
04 /
MCCOY, Adam, M. 1707 Van Damme Drive Davis, CA 95616 / US | |||
Former [2014/09] | 01 /
SAXONOV, Serge 5799 Balmoral Drive Oakland, CA 94619-2439 / US | ||
02 /
DUBE, Simant 4301 Lake Washington Boulevard NE Kirkland Washington 98033 / US | |||
03 /
HINDSON, Benjamin, J. 1039 Bannock Street Livermore, CA 94551 / US | |||
04 /
MCCOY, Adam, M. 1707 Van Damme Drive Davis, CA 95616 / US | |||
Former [2014/04] | 01 /
SAXONOV, Serge 6676 Heartwood Drive Oakland, CA 94611 / US | ||
02 /
DUBE, Simant 5386 Case Avenue, Apt. 1621 Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | |||
03 /
HINDSON, Benjamin, J. 1039 Bannock Street Livermore, CA 94551 / US | |||
04 /
MCCOY, Adam, M. 1707 Van Damme Drive Davis, CA 95616 / US | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2020/47] |
Former [2014/04] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 12760944.4 | 19.03.2012 | [2020/47] | WO2012US29712 | Priority number, date | US201161454373P | 18.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161454373 P | [2014/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012129187 | Date: | 27.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2686449 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2686449 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6851, G16B5/00, G16B20/00, G16B25/00 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6851 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q1/686 (US);
G16B20/00 (EP,US);
G16B20/20 (EP,CN,US);
G16B25/00 (EP,US);
G16B25/20 (EP,CN,US);
G16B5/00 (EP,US);
G06F17/10 (US);
G06F17/11 (US);
G06F17/12 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6851, C12Q2537/143, C12Q2537/165, C12Q2563/159 (CN,EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/04] | C12Q1/68, G01N21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIPLEXIERTE DIGITALASSAYS MIT KOMBINATORISCHER NUTZUNG VON SIGNALEN | [2014/04] | English: | MULTIPLEXED DIGITAL ASSAYS WITH COMBINATORIAL USE OF SIGNALS | [2014/04] | French: | ESSAIS NUMÉRIQUES MULTIPLEXÉS AVEC UTILISATION COMBINÉE DE SIGNAUX | [2014/04] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 06.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.04.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.03.2012 | AL | 18.11.2020 | AT | 18.11.2020 | CY | 18.11.2020 | CZ | 18.11.2020 | DK | 18.11.2020 | EE | 18.11.2020 | ES | 18.11.2020 | FI | 18.11.2020 | HR | 18.11.2020 | IT | 18.11.2020 | LT | 18.11.2020 | LV | 18.11.2020 | MC | 18.11.2020 | MK | 18.11.2020 | MT | 18.11.2020 | NL | 18.11.2020 | PL | 18.11.2020 | RO | 18.11.2020 | RS | 18.11.2020 | SE | 18.11.2020 | SI | 18.11.2020 | SK | 18.11.2020 | SM | 18.11.2020 | TR | 18.11.2020 | BG | 18.02.2021 | NO | 18.02.2021 | GR | 19.02.2021 | IS | 18.03.2021 | PT | 18.03.2021 | IE | 19.03.2021 | LU | 19.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 19.03.2012 | |
AL | 18.11.2020 | ||
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
MK | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
TR | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 19.03.2012 | |
AL | 18.11.2020 | ||
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
MK | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 19.03.2012 | |
AL | 18.11.2020 | ||
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
LU | 19.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
IT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 18.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO03064691 (GLOBAL GENOMICS AB [SE], et al) [Y] 7-10 * abstract * * page 24, line 14 - line 30 *; | [XY]WO2010036352 (QUANTALIFE INC, et al) [X] 1-4,6 * abstract * * page 24, line 14 - line 30 * * page 75, line 22 - line 28 * * page 77, line 23 - line 31 * * page 219, line 27 - line 30 * * page 220, line 1 - line 14 * * page 231, line 20 - line 28 * * page 252, line 16 - line 19 * * page 257, line 23 - line 32 * [Y] 5,7-10; | [A]US2010233686 (HIGUCHI RUSSELL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 24, line 14 - line 30 *; | [Y]US2010248385 (TAN WEIHONG [US], et al) [Y] 5 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0119] *; | [A] - ZHISHAN HUA ET AL, "Multiplexed Real-Time Polymerase Chain Reaction on a Digital Microfluidic Platform", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (20100315), vol. 82, no. 6, doi:10.1021/ac902510u, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 2310 - 2316, XP055138297 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac902510u | [A] - STAVROS THERIANOS ET AL, "Single-Channel Quantitative Multiplex Reverse Transcriptase-Polymerase Chain Reaction for Large Numbers of Gene Products Differentiates Nondemented from Neuropathological Alzheimer's Disease", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY., US, (20040301), vol. 164, no. 3, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 795 - 806, XP055159822 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0002-9440(10)63168-9 | [A] - MARKEY A L ET AL, "High-throughput droplet PCR", METHODS, ACADEMIC PRESS, vol. 50, no. 4, ISSN 1046-2023, (20100401), pages 277 - 281, (20100202), XP026966681 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Concluding remarks * | [A] - BEER N R ET AL, "On-chip, real-time, single-copy polymerase chain reaction in picoliter droplets", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 79, no. 22, doi:10.1021/AC701809W, ISSN 0003-2700, (20071115), pages 8471 - 8475, (20071011), XP002575962 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Conclusions * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac701809w | [A] - YOLANDA SCHAERLI AND FLORIAN HOLLFELDER, "The potential of microfluidic water-in-oil droplets in experimental biology", MOLECULAR BIOSYSTEMS, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, GB, vol. 5, no. 12, doi:10.1039/B907578J, ISSN 1742-206X, (20091201), pages 1392 - 1404, (20091012), XP002669720 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b907578j | International search | [X]WO2010036352 (QUANTALIFE INC, et al); | [Y]US2010248385 (TAN WEIHONG [US], et al); | [YP] - ZHONG ET AL., "Multiplex digital PCR: breaking the one target per color barrier of quantitative PCR", LAB CHIP, (20110517), vol. 11, no. 13, pages 2167 - 2174, XP055109828 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c1lc20126c | [A] - DUBE ET AL., "Mathematical Analysis of Copy Number Variation in a DNA Sample Using Digital PCR on a Nanofluidic Device", PLOS ONE, (20080806), vol. 3, no. 8, pages 1 - 9, XP055094251 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0002876 | [L] - ZHONG ET AL., "Multiplex digital PCR: breaking the one target per color barrier of quantitative PCR", LAB CHIP, vol. 11, no. 13, (20110517), pages 2167 - 2174, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/21584334, (20120808), XP055109828 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c1lc20126c | Examination | WO2010018465 | - QUN ZHONG ET AL, "Multiplex digital PCR: breaking the one target per color barrier of quantitative PCR", LAB ON A CHIP, (20110101), vol. 11, no. 13, doi:10.1039/c1lc20126c, ISSN 1473-0197, page 2167, XP055109828 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c1lc20126c | - KISS M M ET AL, "High-throughput quantitative polymerase chain reaction in picoliter droplets", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 80, no. 23, doi:10.1021/AC801276C, ISSN 0003-2700, (20081201), pages 8975 - 8981, (20081029), XP002575964 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac801276c | - DENIZ PEKIN ET AL, "Quantitative and sensitive detection of rare mutations using droplet-based microfluidics", LAB ON A CHIP, (20110101), vol. 11, no. 13, doi:10.1039/c1lc20128j, ISSN 1473-0197, page 2156, XP055083679 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c1lc20128j | by applicant | US7041481 | US2010173394 | WO2011120006 | WO2011120024 | US2012152369 | US2013040841 | - HARALAMBIDIS J.; CHAI M.; TREGEAR G.W, "Preparation of base-modified nucleosides suitable for non-radioactive label attachment and their incorporation into synthetic oligodeoxyribonucleotides", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1987), vol. 15, pages 4857 - 4876, XP002920183 | - RANDOLPH J.B.; WAGGONER A.S., "Stability, specificity and fluorescence brightness of multiply-labelled fluorescence DNA probes", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 25, pages 2923 - 2929 | - BRUMBAUGH J.A. ET AL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5610 - 5614 | - SINGH D. ET AL, "Oligonucleotides, part 5+: synthesis and fluorescence studies of DNA oligomers d(AT)5 containing adenines covalently linked at C-8 with dansyl fluorophore", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, pages 3339 - 3345 | - TAE SEOK SEO ET AL, "Click Chemistry to Construct Fluorescent Oligonucleotides for DNA Sequencing", J. ORG. CHEM., (2003), vol. 68, doi:doi:10.1021/jo026615r, pages 609 - 612, XP002387640 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo026615r |