EP2690695 - FUEL CELL POWER GENERATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2014/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAKU, Hiroaki c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
MIYAUCHI, Shinji c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
OISHI, Hitoshi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
ZHANG, Rui c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2014/05] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12761149.9 | 07.03.2012 | WO2012JP01567 | Priority number, date | JP20110063700 | 23.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011063700 | JP20120049208 | 06.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012049208 | [2014/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012127800 | Date: | 27.09.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2690695 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/06, G06Q10/00 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
G06Q10/20 (EP,US);
H01M8/04686 (EP,US);
H01M8/0675 (EP,US);
H01M8/04664 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y04S10/50 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/05] | H01M8/04, H01M8/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLEN-LEISTUNGSERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM | [2014/05] | English: | FUEL CELL POWER GENERATION APPARATUS | [2014/05] | French: | APPAREIL DE GÉNÉRATION D'ÉLECTRICITÉ À PILE À COMBUSTIBLE | [2014/05] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2013 | Translation filed | 12.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/05] | 09.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/46] | 10.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006141299 (PICCIRILLO NICOLA [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0031] - [0033] - [0050] *; | [A]US2006289213 (CERVANTES ADAN R [US]) [A] 1-9* paragraphs [0019] - [0021] *; | [Y]US2007224471 (TANAKA YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0013] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0150] - [0152] *; | [Y]JP2010218879 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * | International search | [Y]JP2000210518 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2004362856 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO); | [A]JP2005111112 (MIKUNI KOGYO KK); | [A]JP2008305808 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al); | [A]JP2010218879 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2010272310 (AISIN SEIKI, et al); | [A]JP2011052928 (PALOMA KOGYO KK) | by applicant | JP2004362856 |