Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9256138 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2016 | B2 | US2013335718 | 19.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201110068060 | 21.03.2011 | WO2012CN72693 | 21.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2690496 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2016 | B1 | EP2690496 | 28.01.2015 | A4 | EP2690496 | 29.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201110068060 | 21.03.2011 | WO2012CN72693 | 21.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG192887 | 30.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201110068060 | 21.03.2011 | WO2012CN72693 | 21.03.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012126364 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201110068060 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102692820B | Global Dossier | 17.12.2014 | B | CN102692820 | 26.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201110068060 | 21.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI486722B | 01.06.2015 | B | TW201245903 | 16.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201110068060 | 21.03.2011 |