EP2750851 - MULTILAYERED ROTOMOULDED ARTICLES COMPRISING A LAYER OF POLYESTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | [2014/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAZIERS, Eric 52 Avenue de la Motte-Baraffe B-7180 Seneffe / BE | [2014/28] | Representative(s) | Raboin, Jean-Christophe, et al Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | [2017/24] |
Former [2014/28] | Leyder, Francis Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | Application number, filing date | 12761568.0 | 07.09.2012 | [2017/24] | WO2012EP67527 | Priority number, date | EP20110180723 | 09.09.2011 Original published format: EP 11180723 | EP20120172633 | 19.06.2012 Original published format: EP 12172633 | [2014/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013034701 | Date: | 14.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2750851 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2750851 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B29C41/06, B29C41/22, C08L23/04, C08L67/04, C08L23/08, C08L25/08, B32B1/02, B32B27/08, B32B27/36, B32B27/28, B32B27/32, B32B5/20 | [2014/28] | CPC: |
B29C41/06 (EP,US);
B32B3/26 (US);
B29C41/003 (EP,US);
B29C41/22 (EP,US);
B32B1/00 (EP,US);
B32B27/065 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/308 (EP,US);
B32B27/327 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
C08L23/04 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,US);
B32B2250/02 (EP,US);
B32B2250/03 (EP,US);
B32B2250/24 (EP,US);
B32B2250/40 (EP,US);
B32B2255/10 (EP,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,US);
B32B2266/0242 (EP,US);
B32B2266/025 (EP,US);
B32B2266/0264 (EP,US);
B32B2270/00 (EP,US);
B32B2307/3065 (EP,US);
B32B2307/308 (EP,US);
B32B2307/406 (EP,US);
B32B2307/538 (EP,US);
B32B2307/54 (EP,US);
B32B2307/558 (EP,US);
B32B2307/584 (EP,US);
B32B2307/708 (EP,US);
B32B2307/71 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7163 (EP,US);
B32B2307/72 (EP,US);
B32B2307/728 (EP,US);
B32B2307/73 (EP,US);
B32B2307/734 (EP,US);
B32B2439/40 (EP,US);
B32B2439/60 (EP,US);
B32B2439/62 (EP,US);
B32B2439/66 (EP,US);
B32B2605/08 (EP,US);
C08L23/08 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249994 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31797 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/04, C08L23/00, C08L23/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE DREHGEFORMTE ARTIKEL ENTHALTEND EINE POLYESTERSCHICHT | [2016/51] | English: | MULTILAYERED ROTOMOULDED ARTICLES COMPRISING A LAYER OF POLYESTER | [2014/28] | French: | ARTICLES ROTOMOULÉS MULTICOUCHES COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE DE POLYESTER | [2014/28] |
Former [2014/28] | MEHRSCHICHTIGE DREHGEFORMTE ARTIKEL MIT EINER POLYESTERSCHICHT | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/28] | 09.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.06.2017 | CY | 14.06.2017 | EE | 14.06.2017 | FI | 14.06.2017 | HR | 14.06.2017 | LT | 14.06.2017 | LV | 14.06.2017 | MC | 14.06.2017 | MK | 14.06.2017 | PT | 14.06.2017 | RO | 14.06.2017 | RS | 14.06.2017 | SE | 14.06.2017 | SM | 14.06.2017 | LU | 07.09.2017 | MT | 07.09.2017 | BG | 14.09.2017 | NO | 14.09.2017 | GR | 15.09.2017 | IS | 14.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | CY | 14.06.2017 | |
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MK | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
MT | 07.09.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | CY | 14.06.2017 | |
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MK | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
MT | 07.09.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CY | 14.06.2017 | |
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
MT | 07.09.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
MT | 07.09.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3936565 (GOOD ELMER H); | [A]US3976821 (CARROW GUY E, et al); | [Y]EP1721739 (TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RES FELUY [BE]); | [Y]EP1721931 (TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RES FELUY [BE]); | [IP]WO2012112266 (FINA TECHNOLOGY [US], et al); | [IP]WO2012112267 (FINA TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) | by applicant | US4131731 | US5053522 | US5053485 | US5117008 | WO9802480 | EP1116713 | FR2843390 | WO2008037772 | WO2008151988 | WO2010081887 | WO2010097463 | WO2011EP57988 |