EP2764702 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING INFORMATION FOR A MULTIMEDIA CONTENT ITEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Madison Patent Holdings, SAS 3, Rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/40] | For all designated states InterDigital Madison Patent Holdings 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2017/21] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing DTV 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [2014/33] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMBERT, Anne 13 allée Romy Schneider F-35135 Chantepie / FR | 02 /
ORLAC, Izabela 47 rue de la Berthelotière F-35160 Breteil / FR | 03 /
CHEVALLIER, Louis 6 rue des Mimosas F-35520 La Mézière / FR | [2014/35] |
Former [2014/33] | 01 /
LAMBERT, Anne 13 allée Romy Schneider F-35135 Chantepie / FR | ||
02 /
ORLAC, Izabela 5C rue des Chauffaux F-35160 Breteil / FR | |||
03 /
CHEVALLIER, Louis 6 rue des Mimosas F-35520 La Mézière / FR | Representative(s) | Interdigital Immeuble ZEN 2 845 A, avenue des Champs Blancs 35510 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Schmidt-Uhlig, Thomas, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 12761630.8 | 24.09.2012 | WO2012EP68739 | Priority number, date | EP20110306295 | 06.10.2011 Original published format: EP 11306295 | [2014/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013050265 | Date: | 11.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2764702 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/854, H04N21/472, H04N21/235, H04N21/435 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/472 (EP,US);
H04N21/854 (US);
H04N21/85403 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/33] | H04N21/472, H04N21/235, H04N21/435 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON INFORMATIONEN ÜBER ELEMENTE MIT MULTIMEDIAINHALT | [2021/07] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING INFORMATION FOR A MULTIMEDIA CONTENT ITEM | [2014/33] | French: | METHODE ET APPAREIL POUR FOURNIR DES INFORMATIONS POUR UN CONTENU MULTIMEDIA | [2019/41] |
Former [2014/33] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON INFORMATIONEN FÜR EIN MULTIMEDIAINHALTSELEMENT | ||
Former [2014/33] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR FOURNIR DES INFORMATIONS RELATIVES À UN ARTICLE DE CONTENU MULTIMÉDIA | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 20.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/45] | 22.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2007015047 (NDS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0106] * * paragraph [0158] - paragraph [0159] ** paragraph [0192] *; | [XA]WO2009039055 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1,14 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035] * [A] 2-13; | [A]GB2469575 (IPV LTD [GB]) [A] 1-14 * page 4, line 1 - page 6, line 5 *; | [A]GB2473885 (FIORENZA GUSTAVO [MX], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 5 - page 8 * |