EP2872903 - MEASURING DEVICE, USE OF THE MEASURING DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR MEASURING AN ALTERNATING VOLTAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2015/21] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DÖSCH, Peter Amselweg 3 90547 Stein / DE | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 12762239.7 | 04.09.2012 | [2023/30] | WO2012EP67226 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014037032 | Date: | 13.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2872903 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2872903 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/06, G01R19/25 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
G01R15/16 (EP);
G01R15/183 (EP);
G01R19/2503 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MESSGERÄT, ANWENDUNG DES MESSGERÄTS UND VERFAHREN ZUM MESSEN EINER WECHSELSPANNUNG | [2015/21] | English: | MEASURING DEVICE, USE OF THE MEASURING DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR MEASURING AN ALTERNATING VOLTAGE | [2015/21] | French: | APPAREIL DE MESURE, UTILISATION DE L'APPAREIL DE MESURE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR MESURER UNE TENSION ALTERNATIVE | [2015/21] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 17.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.04.2020 | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | IE | 04.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
IE | 04.09.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE1051388 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 12 * the whole document * [I] 1-11,13; | [A]US5473244 (LIBOVE JOEL M [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 10, line 16 - column 12, line 6; figure 19 * * column 18, line 10 - column 21, line 56 *; | [A]WO2005031374 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document * | by applicant | EP1664804 |