EP2747772 - OPHTHALMIC FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Altacor Limited St Johns Innovation Centre Cowley Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0WS / GB | [2014/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRAWFORD, Francesca Altacor Limited St. John's Innovation Centre Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WS / GB | 02 /
GUNNING, Philip Altacor Limited St. John's Innovation Centre Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WS / GB | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | Teuten, Andrew John, et al Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Teuten, Andrew John, et al Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12762365.0 | 24.08.2012 | WO2012GB52082 | Priority number, date | GB20110014725 | 25.08.2011 Original published format: GB 201114725 | [2014/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013027065 | Date: | 28.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2747772 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2747772 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/79, A61K33/18, A61K47/38, A61K9/00, A61K9/08, A61K9/12, A61P31/00, A61P31/04, A61P31/10 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
A61K31/79 (EP,US);
A61K33/18 (EP,US);
A61K47/38 (EP,US);
A61K9/0048 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/79, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/18, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2014/27] | A61K31/79, A61K9/00, A61K33/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPHTHALMIKUM | [2015/02] | English: | OPHTHALMIC FORMULATIONS | [2014/27] | French: | FORMULATION OPHTALMIQUE | [2015/02] |
Former [2014/27] | OPHTHALMISCHE FORMULIERUNGEN | ||
Former [2014/27] | PRÉPARATIONS OPHTALMIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/27] | 25.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.08.2012 | AL | 05.08.2015 | AT | 05.08.2015 | BG | 05.08.2015 | CY | 05.08.2015 | CZ | 05.08.2015 | DK | 05.08.2015 | EE | 05.08.2015 | FI | 05.08.2015 | HR | 05.08.2015 | LT | 05.08.2015 | LV | 05.08.2015 | MC | 05.08.2015 | MK | 05.08.2015 | MT | 05.08.2015 | PL | 05.08.2015 | RO | 05.08.2015 | RS | 05.08.2015 | SI | 05.08.2015 | SK | 05.08.2015 | SM | 05.08.2015 | TR | 05.08.2015 | LU | 24.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | NO | 05.11.2015 | GR | 06.11.2015 | IS | 05.12.2015 | PT | 07.12.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 24.08.2012 | |
AT | 05.08.2015 | ||
BG | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MK | 05.08.2015 | ||
MT | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
SM | 05.08.2015 | ||
TR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LU | 24.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 24.08.2012 | |
AT | 05.08.2015 | ||
BG | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MT | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
SM | 05.08.2015 | ||
LU | 24.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 24.08.2012 | |
AT | 05.08.2015 | ||
BG | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MT | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
SM | 05.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MT | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 05.08.2015 | |
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 05.08.2015 | |
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 05.08.2015 | |
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 05.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0476777 (DAGRA PHARMA BV [NL]) [A] 1-28 * the whole document * * column 3, line 12 - line 21 * * example 1 * * claims 1,4-9 *; | [A]US5126127 (BHAGWAT DILEEP [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 23 * * column 6, line 9 - line 16 * * column 6, line 44 - line 52 * * column 7, line 18 - line 35 * * example 1 * | by applicant | US5849291 | WO2007106381 | WO2009097123 | US5232692 | US4364929 | US4954351 | US5709851 | US5643608 | US5178853 | US4976969 | US5126127 | WO2004064804 | - GHOSH ET AL., ANAESTHESIA, (2006), vol. 61, pages 1116 - 1129 | - ISENBERG ET AL., COMMUNITY EYE HEALTH, (2003), vol. 16, pages 30 - 31 | - FERGUSON ET AL., BRITISH JOURNAL OF OPHTHALMOLOGY, (2003), vol. 87, pages 163 - 167 |