EP2693845 - METAL PARTICLE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2018 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 25.05.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2014/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUURA, Tomohiro c/o Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 6, Kitahara Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-3294 / JP | [2014/06] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/06] | Jackson, Martin Peter J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12764351.8 | 30.03.2012 | WO2012JP58599 | Priority number, date | JP20110079476 | 31.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011079476 | JP20110245337 | 09.11.2011 Original published format: JP 2011245337 | JP20120018647 | 31.01.2012 Original published format: JP 2012018647 | [2014/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012133778 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2693845 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/22, B82Y20/00, H01L31/052, H01L33/44, H01L51/50, H01L51/52 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
G02B5/008 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y20/00 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/02168 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/056 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/85 (US);
C08G2261/3142 (EP,KR,US);
C08G2261/3223 (EP,KR,US);
C08G2261/3246 (EP,KR,US);
C08G2261/3422 (EP,KR,US);
C08G2261/95 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/805 (US);
Y02E10/52 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/06] | H05B33/22, B82Y20/00, H01L31/052, H01L33/44, H01L51/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Title | German: | METALLPARTIKELANORDNUNG | [2014/06] | English: | METAL PARTICLE ASSEMBLY | [2014/06] | French: | AGRÉGAT PARTICULAIRE MÉTALLIQUE | [2014/06] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2013 | Translation filed | 04.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 29.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/26] | 24.05.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.07.2018 | 04.07.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2217913 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [XD] - TOMOHIRO FUKUURA ET AL, "Long Range Enhancement of Molecular Fluorescence by Closely Packed Submicro-scale Ag Islands", E-JOURNAL OF SURFACE SCIENCE AND NANOTECHNOLOGY, (20090101), vol. 7, doi:10.1380/ejssnt.2009.653, pages 653 - 659, XP055132409 [XD] 1-10 * page 655, paragraph B - page 657 * * page 658, column 1, line 27 - line 30 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1380/ejssnt.2009.653 | International search | [A]JP2007017432 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2007501391 (UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH); | [A]WO2008082569 (NANOLAMBDA INC [US], et al); | [A]JP2009074947 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP); | [A]WO2011027830 (UNIV HOKKAIDO NAT UNIV CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH08271431 | WO2005033335 | JP2007139540 | - T. FUKUURA; M. KAWASAKI, "Long Range Enhancement of Molecular Fluorescence by Closely Packed Submicro-scale Ag Islands", E-JOURNAL OF SURFACE SCIENCE AND NANOTECHNOLOGY, (2009), vol. 7, page 653 | - Particle Measurement Technique, NIKKAN KOGYO SHIMBUN, LTD., (1994), page 5 | - K. LANCE KELLY ET AL., "The Optical Properties of Metal Nanoparticles: The Influence of Size, Shape, and Dielectric Environment", THE JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY B, (2003), vol. 107, doi:doi:10.1021/jp026731y, page 668, XP055034185 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp026731y |