EP2692915 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING BIO-SOLUBLE INORGANIC FIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nichias Corporation 6-1, Hatchobori 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8555 / JP | [2017/17] |
Former [2014/06] | For all designated states Nichias Corporation 1-26, Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAHARA, Hideki c/o NICHIAS CORPORATION 1-26, Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | 02 /
MOCHIDA, Takahito c/o NICHIAS CORPORATION 1-26, Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | 03 /
NAKAJIMA, Takashi c/o NICHIAS CORPORATION 1-26, Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | 04 /
MIHARA, Tetsuya c/o NICHIAS CORPORATION 1-26, Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | 05 /
YONAIYAMA, Ken c/o NICHIAS CORPORATION 1-26, Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | 06 /
KOBAYASHI, Noboru c/o NICHIAS CORPORATION 1-26, Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | 07 /
ABE, Ikuo c/o NICHIAS CORPORATION 1-26, Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | 08 /
NAGASE, Hideo c/o NICHIAS CORPORATION 1-26, Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | [2017/18] |
Former [2014/06] | 01 /
KITAHARA, Hideki c/o NICHIAS CORPORATION 1-26 Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | ||
02 /
MOCHIDA, Takahito c/o NICHIAS CORPORATION 1-26 Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKAJIMA, Takashi c/o NICHIAS CORPORATION 1-26 Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | |||
04 /
MIHARA, Tetsuya c/o NICHIAS CORPORATION 1-26 Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | |||
05 /
YONAIYAMA, Ken c/o NICHIAS CORPORATION 1-26 Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | |||
06 /
KOBAYASHI, Noboru c/o NICHIAS CORPORATION 1-26 Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | |||
07 /
ABE, Ikuo c/o NICHIAS CORPORATION 1-26 Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | |||
08 /
NAGASE, Hideo c/o NICHIAS CORPORATION 1-26 Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Joseph Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2017/18] |
Former [2014/06] | Schmitz, Joseph Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 12765912.6 | 14.03.2012 | [2017/18] | WO2012JP01787 | Priority number, date | JP20110077940 | 31.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011077940 | [2014/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012132287 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2692915 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2692915 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | D01F9/08, C03B37/05, C03C13/00 | [2014/06] | CPC: |
C03B37/055 (EP,US);
D01F9/08 (KR);
C03B37/05 (KR);
C03B5/26 (EP,US);
C03C13/00 (KR);
C03C13/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG BIOLÖSLICHER ANORGANISCHER FASERN | [2014/06] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING BIO-SOLUBLE INORGANIC FIBER | [2014/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE FIBRE INORGANIQUE BIOSOLUBLE | [2014/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2013 | Translation filed | 30.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 08.10.2013 | Observations by third parties | 10.07.2014 | Observations by third parties | 03.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2015 | Observations by third parties | 19.05.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.05.2016 | 24.05.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2016 | Observations by third parties | 27.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2012 | AL | 03.05.2017 | AT | 03.05.2017 | CY | 03.05.2017 | CZ | 03.05.2017 | DK | 03.05.2017 | EE | 03.05.2017 | ES | 03.05.2017 | FI | 03.05.2017 | HR | 03.05.2017 | IT | 03.05.2017 | LT | 03.05.2017 | LV | 03.05.2017 | MC | 03.05.2017 | MK | 03.05.2017 | NL | 03.05.2017 | PL | 03.05.2017 | PT | 03.05.2017 | RO | 03.05.2017 | RS | 03.05.2017 | SE | 03.05.2017 | SI | 03.05.2017 | SK | 03.05.2017 | SM | 03.05.2017 | TR | 03.05.2017 | BG | 03.08.2017 | NO | 03.08.2017 | GR | 04.08.2017 | IS | 03.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 14.03.2012 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PT | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 14.03.2012 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PT | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4238213 (PALLO JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 3-5 * column 4, lines 10-34; figure 1; table - *; | [Y]JPS56114846 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD) [Y] 8 * figures 2-3 *; | [A]JPS63239136 (NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL CO) [A] 13* abstract *; | [A]WO9212941 (ROCKWOOL INT [DK]) [A] 3-5 * page 16, lines 1-12; figure 1 * * page 18, lines 14-30 *; | [Y]WO9716386 (UNIFRAX CORP [US]) [Y] 1-14 * page 16, line 21 - page 17, line 5; claims 10,11; table IIIA * * page 20, lines 6-29; example 3 * * page 33, lines 1-10 *; | [Y]US5954852 (JENSEN CARSTEN [DK], et al) [Y] 1-14 * column 3, lines 45-61; figure 1; claim 1 * * column 4, lines 5-10,38-44 * * column 5, lines 7-20,30-35,36-49 *; | [Y]EP1323687 (KUMKANG KOREA CHEM CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0030] , [0031]; examples 1-9 *; | [Y]WO2005000971 (UNIFRAX CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 1, lines 6-10; claim 4 * * page 5, lines 29-31 * * page 9, lines 15-22 * * page 15, lines 13-17 *; | [Y]WO2006048610 (MORGAN CRUCIBLE CO [GB], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 5, lines 12-20 *; | [Y]EP1760051 (NICHIAS CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0022] - [0026] - [0029]; figure 1; examples 1-3; table 2 *; | [Y]WO2007086677 (KCC CORP [KR], et al) [Y] 1-13 * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 25 * * page 8, lines 4-10 * * page 9, lines 12-19; examples 1-7 * | International search | [Y]JPS63239135 (NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]JP2005514318 (THE MORGAN CRUCIBLE COMPANY PLC.); | [Y]JP2008088015 (JFE STEEL KK, et al) | by applicant | JPS63230535 | JPS63239135 | JPH06504257 | JP3260367B | JP2003105658 | JP2005514318 | JP3753416B | JP2010189798 | JP2010202983 | other | WO03059835 | US2007049481 |