EP2758139 - A GOLF PUTTING AIMING AID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Egan, Leslie 29 Ros na Ri Shanaway Road Ennis County Clare / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | For all designated states Egan, Leslie 29 Ros na Ri Shanaway Road Ennis County Clare / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/31] | Representative(s) | Litton, Rory Francis Cruickshank 8a Sandyford Business Centre Sandyford Dublin 18 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | Litton, Rory Francis Cruickshank & Co. 8a Sandyford Business Centre Sandyford Dublin 18 / IE | Application number, filing date | 12766051.2 | 20.09.2012 | [2015/50] | WO2012EP68578 | Priority number, date | IE20110000433 | 21.09.2011 Original published format: IE 20110433 | [2014/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013041644 | Date: | 28.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2758139 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2758139 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A63B71/06, A63B69/36, A63B24/00, A63B71/02 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
A63B69/36 (EP,US);
A63B69/3667 (EP,US);
A63B69/3676 (EP,US);
A63B71/06 (EP,US);
A63B2024/0043 (EP,US);
A63B2071/026 (EP,US);
A63B2071/0694 (EP,US);
A63B2102/32 (EP,US);
A63B2220/16 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/31] | A63B69/36, A63B71/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZIELHILFE FÜR GOLFPUTTING | [2014/31] | English: | A GOLF PUTTING AIMING AID | [2014/31] | French: | APPAREIL POUR LE GOLF | [2014/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 01.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.03.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.09.2012 | AL | 09.12.2015 | AT | 09.12.2015 | BE | 09.12.2015 | BG | 09.12.2015 | CY | 09.12.2015 | CZ | 09.12.2015 | DK | 09.12.2015 | EE | 09.12.2015 | FI | 09.12.2015 | HR | 09.12.2015 | LT | 09.12.2015 | LV | 09.12.2015 | MC | 09.12.2015 | MK | 09.12.2015 | PL | 09.12.2015 | RO | 09.12.2015 | RS | 09.12.2015 | SI | 09.12.2015 | SK | 09.12.2015 | SM | 09.12.2015 | TR | 09.12.2015 | NO | 09.03.2016 | GR | 10.03.2016 | IS | 09.04.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 20.09.2012 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BG | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
TR | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 20.09.2012 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BG | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/34] | HU | 20.09.2012 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 20.09.2012 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 20.09.2012 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.09.2012 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | LT | 09.12.2015 | |
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 09.12.2015 | |
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 09.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009143157 (ROSS JR HERBERT G [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US7727079 (KUHLMAN JR JOHN A [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006122001 (GADDY MARK B [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007099729 (GREEN DANIEL [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0029] * | by applicant | US2008032809 |