EP2753347 - TREATMENT OF ALLODYNIA, HYPERALGSIA, SPONTANEOUS PAIN, AND PHANTOM PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NsGene A/S Baltorpvej 154 2750 Ballerup / DK | [2014/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JØRGENSEN, Jesper Roland Mariendalsvej 73 2.tv. DK-2000 Frederiksberg / DK | 02 /
WAHLBERG, Lars Ulrik 259 Riverside Dr. Tiverton, Rhode Island 02878 / US | 03 /
JOHANSEN, Teit E. Stampeengen 26 DK-2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2014/29] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | Høiberg A/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2014/29] | Høiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59 A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 12766380.5 | 05.09.2012 | [2016/31] | WO2012DK50330 | Priority number, date | US201161531024P | 05.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161531024 P | [2014/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013034157 | Date: | 14.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2753347 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2753347 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, C12N5/00 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
A61K38/185 (EP,US);
A61K38/17 (EP,US);
A61K9/0085 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/29] | Extension states | BA | 07.04.2014 | ME | 07.04.2014 | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON ALLODYNIE, HYPERALGESIE, SPONTANEN SCHMERZEN UND PHANTOMSCHMERZEN | [2014/29] | English: | TREATMENT OF ALLODYNIA, HYPERALGSIA, SPONTANEOUS PAIN, AND PHANTOM PAIN | [2014/29] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE L'ALLODYNIE, DE L'HYPERALGIE, DE LA DOULEUR SPONTANÉE ET DE LA DOULEUR ILLUSIONNELLE | [2014/29] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 29.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.09.2012 | AL | 03.08.2016 | AT | 03.08.2016 | BE | 03.08.2016 | CY | 03.08.2016 | CZ | 03.08.2016 | DK | 03.08.2016 | EE | 03.08.2016 | ES | 03.08.2016 | FI | 03.08.2016 | HR | 03.08.2016 | IT | 03.08.2016 | LT | 03.08.2016 | LV | 03.08.2016 | MC | 03.08.2016 | MK | 03.08.2016 | NL | 03.08.2016 | PL | 03.08.2016 | RO | 03.08.2016 | RS | 03.08.2016 | SE | 03.08.2016 | SI | 03.08.2016 | SK | 03.08.2016 | SM | 03.08.2016 | TR | 03.08.2016 | IE | 05.09.2016 | LU | 05.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | MT | 30.09.2016 | BG | 03.11.2016 | NO | 03.11.2016 | GR | 04.11.2016 | IS | 03.12.2016 | PT | 05.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 05.09.2012 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
TR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.09.2016 | ||
LU | 05.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 05.09.2012 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.09.2016 | ||
LU | 05.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 05.09.2012 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.09.2016 | ||
LU | 05.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.09.2016 | ||
LU | 05.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 03.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XDI]WO2010009732 (NSGENE AS [DK], et al) [XD] 1-28,37-43,45,46,56-62 * page 36, line 2; claims 1,17,37,42,51; sequences 2,7,10 * [I] 29-36,44,47-55; | [XP]WO2012041328 (NSGENE AS [DK], et al) [XP] 1-8,10-62 * claims 1,29,27,38; sequence 3 *; | [A] - NISHINO J ET AL, "Meteorin: a secreted protein that regulates glial cell differentiation and promotes axonal extension", EMBO JOURNAL, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (20040505), vol. 23, no. 9, doi:10.1038/SJ.EMBOJ.7600202, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 1998 - 2008, XP002334608 [A] 1-62 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.emboj.7600202 | by applicant | US4407957 | US4868116 | US4892538 | US5106627 | US5156844 | WO9219195 | US5219990 | WO9322437 | US5283187 | WO9505452 | US5399346 | US5460959 | US5550050 | US5554148 | US5639275 | US5653975 | WO9734586 | US5677158 | US5798113 | US5800828 | WO0139786 | US6309634 | WO02078730 | US6683058 | WO2005095450 | WO2007100898 | WO2010009732 | - THOMPSON, J.D.; HIGGINS, D.G.; GIBSON, T.J., "CLUSTAL W: improving the sensitivity of progressive multiple sequence alignment through sequence weighting, positions-specific gap penalties and weight matrix choice", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 22, pages 4673 - 4680, XP002956304 | - HIGGINS D.; THOMPSON J.; GIBSON T.; THOMPSON J.D.; HIGGINS D.G.; GIBSON T.J., "CLUSTAL W: improving the sensitivity of progressive multiple sequence alignment through sequence weighting, position-specific gap penalties and weight matrix choice", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, pages 4673 - 4680, XP002956304 | - PEARSON WR, METHODS MOL BIOL, (2000), vol. 132, pages 185 - 219 | - REAGAN-SHAW ET AL., FASEB J, (2007), vol. 22, pages 659 - 661 | - JØRGENSEN ET AL., EXP NEUROL, (2012), vol. 233, pages 172 - 81 | - WOLD, F., Posttranslational Covalent Modification of Proteins, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1983), pages 1 - 12 | - SEIFTER ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1990), vol. 182, pages 626 - 646 | - RATTAN ET AL., "Protein Synthesis: Posttranslational Modifications and Aging", ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1992), vol. 663, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1749-6632.1992.tb38648.x, pages 48 - 62, XP009082490 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1992.tb38648.x | - KUPERS,R.; YU,W.; PERSSON,J.K.; XU,X.J.; WIESENFELD-HALLIN,Z., "Photochemically-induced ischemia of the rat sciatic nerve produces a dose-dependent and highly reproducible mechanical, heat and cold allodynia, and signs of spontaneous pain", PAIN, (1998), vol. 76, pages 45 - 59 | - STORKSON,R.V.; KJORSVIK,A.; TJOLSEN,A.; HOLE,K., "Lumbar catheterization of the spinal subarachnoid space in the rat", J. NEUROSCI. METHODS, (1996), vol. 65, pages 167 - 172 |