Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9556508 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2017 | B2 | US2014242417 | 28.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP68296 | 18.09.2012 | DE102011083054 | 20.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014534048 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP68296 | 18.09.2012 | DE102011083054 | 20.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104039449B | Global Dossier | 09.11.2016 | B | CN104039449 | 10.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP68296 | 18.09.2012 | DE102011083054 | 20.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2758171 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP68296 | 18.09.2012 | DE102011083054 | 20.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2849042 | 28.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP68296 | 18.09.2012 | DE102011083054 | 20.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013041506 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011083054 | 20.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102011083054 | 21.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011083054 | 20.09.2011 |