EP2726053 - CATIONIC CONDITIONER REPLACEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Union Carbide Chemicals & Plastics Technology LLC 2020 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2014/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JORDAN, Susan L. 61 John Dyer Way Doylestown, PA 18902 / US | [2014/19] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2018/43] |
Former [2014/19] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12766794.7 | 14.09.2012 | [2018/43] | WO2012US55389 | Priority number, date | US201161540803P | 29.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161540803 P | [2014/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013048780 | Date: | 04.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2726053 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2726053 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/46, A61K8/73, A61K8/891, A61Q5/12, A61Q19/10, A61K8/04 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
A61K8/891 (EP,US);
A61K8/585 (US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
A61Q5/12 (EP,US);
A61K2800/594 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERSATZ FÜR KATIONISCHEN PFLEGEBALSAM | [2014/19] | English: | CATIONIC CONDITIONER REPLACEMENTS | [2014/19] | French: | PRODUITS DE SUBSTITUTION POUR CONDITIONNEURS CATIONIQUES | [2014/19] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 11.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 05.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.09.2012 | AL | 24.10.2018 | AT | 24.10.2018 | CY | 24.10.2018 | CZ | 24.10.2018 | DK | 24.10.2018 | EE | 24.10.2018 | ES | 24.10.2018 | FI | 24.10.2018 | HR | 24.10.2018 | IT | 24.10.2018 | LT | 24.10.2018 | LV | 24.10.2018 | MC | 24.10.2018 | MK | 24.10.2018 | MT | 24.10.2018 | NL | 24.10.2018 | PL | 24.10.2018 | RO | 24.10.2018 | RS | 24.10.2018 | SE | 24.10.2018 | SI | 24.10.2018 | SK | 24.10.2018 | SM | 24.10.2018 | TR | 24.10.2018 | BG | 24.01.2019 | NO | 24.01.2019 | GR | 25.01.2019 | IS | 24.02.2019 | PT | 24.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 14.09.2012 | |
AL | 24.10.2018 | ||
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
MT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 14.09.2012 | |
AL | 24.10.2018 | ||
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 24.10.2018 | |
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 24.10.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5358667 (BERGMANN WOLFGANG [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,11 * columns 27,28; example 1 * * column 21, line 61 - column 22, line 19 * * column 23, lines 23-36 * * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 13 * * column 31, lines 40-50; figures 4-7 * [Y] 1-11; | [X]WO2009006212 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,11 * page 1, lines 5,6 * * page 5, lines 10-18 * * page 3 * * page 15, line 20 - page 16, line 2 *; | [X]JP3765858B (SUNSTAR INC) [X] 1-3,8,10 * page 1, paragraph 6 * * page 3, paragraph 12 * * page 7, paragraph 35 *; | [Y]US2005287087 (HUANG YANBIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 1, paragraphs 5-7 * * page 2, paragraph 17 *; | [Y]JP2008001628 (ICHIMARU PHARCOS INC, et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 9 * * page 45, paragraph 157 *; | [X]EP0412710 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * page 3, lines 7-16,22-49 * * page 21; example 2 *; | [AD]US6235893 (REIBERT KENNETH C [US], et al) [AD] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008260836 (BOYD THOMAS JAMES [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 1, paragraphs 4-10 * * page 2, paragraphs 18,19,25 * * page 5, paragraph 64 * * page 9, paragraph 79 *; | [A]US6280745 (FLORE STEPHEN G [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [T] - DOW CHEMICALS, "Methocel cellulose ethers - Technical handbook", INTERNET CITATION, (20020901), pages 1 - 29, URL: http://www.dow.com/dowwolff/en/pdfs/192-01062.pdf, (20110329), XP002629689 [T] * pages 18-25 * | [A] - TAKEUCHI MASANOBU ET AL, "RHEOLOGICAL PROPERTIES OF REVERSIBLE THERMO SETTING IN SITU GELLING SOLUTION WITH METHYLCELLULOSE-POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL CITRIC ACID TERNARY SYSTEM", COLLOID & POLYMER SCIENCE, SPRINGER VERLAG, HEIDELBERG, DE, (20030401), vol. 281, no. 12, doi:10.1007/S00396-003-0893-2, ISSN 0303-402X, pages 1178 - 1183, XP002349553 [A] 1-11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00396-003-0893-2 | Examination | WO0059947 | by applicant | US6235893 |