EP2695673 - EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2014/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAGI, Nobuyuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
SOBUE, Yuichi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
IKEDA, Hanae c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
KAMADA, Masaya c/o TOYOTA TECHNICAL DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 1-21, Imae Hanamoto-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 470-0334 / JP | 05 /
INDE, Ryoichi c/o CATALER CORPORATION 7800, Chihama Kakegawa-shi, Shizuoka 437-1492 / JP | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/07] | 01 /
TAKAGI, Nobuyuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
SOBUE, Yuichi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
03 /
IKEDA, Hanae c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
04 /
KAMADA, Masaya c/o TOYOTA TECHNICAL DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 1-21, Imae Hanamoto-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 470-0334 / JP | |||
05 /
INDE, Ryoichi c/o CATALER CORPORATION 7800, Chihama Kakegawa-shi, Shizuoka 437-1492 / JP | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 12767402.6 | 06.04.2012 | WO2012JP59559 | Priority number, date | JP20110086552 | 08.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011086552 | [2014/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012137937 | Date: | 11.10.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2695673 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.10.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/44, B01D53/94, F01N3/08, F01N3/10, F01N3/24, F01N3/28 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
B01D53/945 (EP,US);
B01J23/44 (EP,KR,US);
B01J29/74 (US);
B01D53/94 (KR);
B01J23/42 (EP,US);
B01J37/0244 (EP,US);
F01N3/08 (KR);
F01N3/10 (KR);
F01N3/24 (KR);
F01N3/28 (KR);
B01D2255/1021 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1023 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20707 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20715 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2092 (EP,US);
B01D2255/9022 (EP,US);
B01D2255/912 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00 (EP,US);
F01N2510/0684 (EP,US);
F01N3/0814 (EP,US);
F01N3/0835 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Title | German: | ABGASREINIGUNGSKATALYSATOR | [2014/07] | English: | EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION CATALYST | [2014/07] | French: | CATALYSEUR DE PURIFICATION DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT | [2014/07] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2013 | Translation filed | 28.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 12.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/11] | 08.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2008045405 (BEUTEL TILMAN WOLFRAM [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0037] , [0068] , [0069] * [Y] 1,6; | [Y]US2010186375 (KAZI M SHAHJAHAN [US], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0018] *; | [Y]US2010166629 (DEEBA MICHEL [US]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0032] *; | [Y]WO2010129490 (BASF CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1 * page 24, line 29 - line 30 *; | [Y]US2010290964 (SOUTHWARD BARRY W L [DE], et al) [Y] 6 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US2010180582 (MUELLER-STACH TORSTEN WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0017] * | International search | [A]JP2003175318 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [A]JP2002282688 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV); | [A]JPH09926 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV); | [A]JP2009119430 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV); | [A]JP2008062235 (VALTION TEKNILLINEN, et al); | [A]JP2000157870 (DEGUSSA); | [A]JPH01127044 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV, et al) | by applicant | JP2010120008 | JPH11138006 | JP2003290629 | JPH0910594 | JP2003236339 | JP2010029814 | JPH08224449 |