|
03.08.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.08.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
126 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
126 |
|
06.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
06.05.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
06.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2021 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2021 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.05.2021 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.01.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
125 |
|
21.01.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
125 |
|
14.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.05.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.05.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.04.2019 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.12.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2018 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.09.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.02.2015 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2014 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
29.04.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
29.04.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2013 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.11.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
85 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
73 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2012 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
109 |