EP2696647 - AD-HOC NETWORK, USER NODE, MANAGEMENT SERVER, COMMUNICATION METHOD AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2014/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIMURA, Atsushi c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | Robson, Aidan John Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Robson, Aidan John Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 12767715.1 | 05.04.2012 | WO2012JP59397 | Priority number, date | JP20110084510 | 06.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011084510 | [2014/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012137882 | Date: | 11.10.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2696647 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.10.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W40/24, // H04W84/22, H04W48/08, H04W48/20, H04L12/707, H04L12/14 | [2015/40] | CPC: |
H04L45/24 (EP,US);
H04W48/20 (US);
H04W40/246 (EP,US);
H04L43/10 (EP,US);
H04W48/08 (EP,US);
H04W84/22 (EP,US);
Y04S40/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/19] | H04W40/24, // H04W84/22, H04W48/08, H04L12/707 | ||
Former IPC [2014/07] | H04W84/22, H04W4/04, H04W40/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Title | German: | AD-HOC-NETZWERK, BENUTZERKNOTEN, VERWALTUNGSSERVER, KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2014/07] | English: | AD-HOC NETWORK, USER NODE, MANAGEMENT SERVER, COMMUNICATION METHOD AND PROGRAM | [2014/07] | French: | RÉSEAU AD-HOC, N UD D'UTILISATEUR, SERVEUR DE GESTION, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION ET PROGRAMME | [2014/07] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2013 | Translation filed | 04.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 23.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0251038 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [X] 8 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 1, line 5 * * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 23 * * page 4, line 3 - page 4, line 6 * * page 4, line 18 - page 4, line 26 * * page 5, line 1 - page 5, line 6 * * page 5, line 18 - page 5, line 27 * * page 7, line 17 - page 7, line 27 * * page 9, line 17 - page 10, line 19 ** figures 1,4 *; | [X]US2005227616 (TAKATANI YUKIHIRO [FR], et al) [X] 8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] , [0011] - [0015] - [0019] , [0020] , [0055] - [0058] - [0061] *; | [XY]EP1599973 (DOCOMO COMM LAB EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [X] 8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0026] , [0027] , [0029] , [0077] - [0079] - [0081] , [0082] * * paragraphs [0122] , [0124] , [0125] , [0182] , [0183] , [0194] - [0196] * * figures 1,8,13 * [Y] 5; | [I]US2008137624 (SILVERSTRIM JAMES E [US], et al) [I] 1-4,6,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0009] , [0010] , [0035] , [0040] - [0044] - [0046] , [0052] , [0053] , [0056] , [0098] , [0111] , [0115] * * figures 1,2 *; | [I]US2009138713 (VEILLETTE MICHEL [CA]) [I] 1-4,6,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0038] - [0040] - [0056] - [0062] - [0064] , [0067] - [0071] - [0074] - [0079] , [0082] , [0092] , [0093] , [0096] , [0109] * * paragraphs [0123] , [0124] , [0128] , [0141] * * figure 1 *; | [XYI] - RUFFINO P STUPAR TILAB S, "Automatic configuration of IPv6 addresses for nodes in a MANET with multiple gateways; draft-ruffino-manet-autoconf-multigw-01.txt", 20051209, (20051209), no. 1, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015043017 [X] 1-3,6,9,10 * abstract * * sections 1, 3, 5.1, 5.2.1, 6.2, 7.3, 7.3.2, 7.4.1, 7.5.1, 7.6 * * figures 1, 2 * [Y] 5 [I] 4,7 | International search | [A]WO2006048936 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2008193318 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2009206749 (AD SOL NISSIN CORP) | by applicant | JP2005079827 | JP2006323440 |