EP2694102 - METHODS OF IMPROVING VACCINE IMMUNOGENICITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Iowa Research Foundation Iowa Centers for Enterprise 112 N. Capitol Street 6 Gilmore Hall Iowa City, IA 52242-5500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states University of Iowa Research Foundation 112 N. Capitol Street 6 Gilmore Hall Iowa City, IA 52242-5500 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BISHOP, Gail UNIVERSITY OF IOWA RESEARCH FOUNDATION 112N Capitol Street 6 Gilmore Hall Iowa City, IA 52242-5500 / US | 02 /
VANDEN BUSH, Tony UNIVERSITY OF IOWA RESEARCH FOUNDATION 112N Capitol Street 6 Gilmore Hall Iowa City, IA 52242-5500 / US | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | Elbel, Michaela PATERIS Patentanwälte PartmbB Postfach 33 07 11 80067 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Elbel, Michaela Pateris Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Altheimer Eck 13 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12768304.3 | 04.04.2012 | WO2012US32190 | Priority number, date | US201161471553P | 04.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161471553 P | [2014/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012138774 | Date: | 11.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2694102 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K38/00, A61K39/12, A61K39/13, A61K39/145, A61K39/29, A61K39/39 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
A61K39/13 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/005 (KR,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/145 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/292 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/385 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/00 (EP,KR);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61K2039/55505 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/6012 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/6037 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/6075 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2730/10134 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2760/16134 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/17] | A61K39/12, A61K38/00, A61K39/00 | ||
Former IPC [2014/07] | A61K39/13 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR VERBESSERTE IMPFSTOFF-IMMUNOGENITÄT | [2014/07] | English: | METHODS OF IMPROVING VACCINE IMMUNOGENICITY | [2014/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'AMÉLIORATION DE L'IMMUNOGÉNICITÉ DE VACCIN | [2014/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 31.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.12.2017 | 13.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/50] | 26.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9214489 (REPLIGEN CORP [US]) [X] 1,13-15 * page 1, lines 6-18; claims 1-19 * * page 15, lines 3-10 *; | [YP]WO2011041691 (UNIV IOWA RES FOUND [US], et al) [YP] 1-15* page 13, lines 1-8; claims 1-41 *; | [Y] - KURIKKA S ED - BETSCH CORNELIA SACHSE KATHARINA, "Priming with diphtheria--tetanus--pertussis vaccine enhances the response to the Haemophilus influenzae type b tetanus conjugate vaccine in infancy", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, (19960901), vol. 14, no. 13, doi:10.1016/S0264-410X(96)00025-4, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 1239 - 1242, XP004069593 [Y] 1-15 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(96)00025-4 | International search | [X]US2007026502 (SALLBERG MATTI [SE], et al); | [Y]US2008090225 (KIRKEGAARD KARLA A [US], et al); | [A]US2008118530 (KEW OLEN M [US], et al); | [A]US2010145015 (GALILI URI [US]); | [A]US2010249021 (GAO GEORGE FU [CN], et al); | [A]US2010254945 (GE QING [US], et al); | [A] - MARTIN ET AL., "Transport of Incoming Influenza Virus Nucleocapsids into the Nucleus.", J VIROL., (1991), vol. 65, no. 1, pages 232 - 244, XP025481483 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0962-8924(92)90130-F | by applicant | US3773919 | EP0058481 | EP0133988 | US4559157 | US4608392 | US4816567 | US4820508 | US4873192 | US4938949 | US4946778 | EP0404097 | US4992478 | US5091513 | WO9214489 | WO9311161 | US5260203 | US5350674 | US5455030 | US5585362 | US5939598 | US2007026502 | - KURIKKA, Vaccine, (19960000), vol. 14, no. 13, pages 1239 - 1242 | - "Genebank", Database accession no. ABI36003 | - "Genebank", Database accession no. ADY00024.1 | - "Genebank", Database accession no. ADY00020.1 | - "Genebank protein", Database accession no. ABI36003 | - HJELM, F. et al., Scand J Immunol, (20060000), vol. 64, pages 177 - 184 | - HIRSH, DC; MACLACHLAN, NJ; WALKER, RL., Veterinary Microbiology, Blackwell Publishing | - MCGHEE, J.R. et al., "On vaccine development", Sem. Hematol., (19930000), vol. 30, pages 3 - 15 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, page 443 | - KUNKEL, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19850000), vol. 82, page 488 | - KUNKEL et al., Meth. Enzymol., (19870000), vol. 154, page 367 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, Nature, (19750000), vol. 256, page 495 | - CLACKSON et al., Nature, (19910000), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628 | - MARKS et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19910000), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - MORRISON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19840000), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855 | - MCCAFFERTY et al., Nature, (19900000), vol. 348, pages 552 - 554 | - MARKS et al., Bio/Technology, (19920000), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - WATERHOUSE et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19930000), vol. 21, pages 2265 - 2266 | - JONES et al., Nature, vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - MORIMOTO et al., Journal of Biochemical and Biophysical Methods, (19920000), vol. 24, pages 107 - 117 | - BRENNAN et al., Science, (19850000), vol. 229, page 81 | - CO, M. S. et al., J. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 152, pages 2968 - 2976 | - BETTER, M.; HORWITZ, A. H., Methods in Enzymology, Academic Press, Inc., (19890000), vol. 178, pages 476 - 496 | - PLUECKTHUN, A.; SKERRA, A., Methods in Enzymology, Academic Press, Inc., (19890000), vol. 178, pages 476 - 496 | - LAMOYI, E., Methods in Enzymology, (19890000), vol. 121, pages 663 - 669 | - BIRD, R. E. et al., TIBTECH, (19910000), vol. 9, pages 132 - 137 | - CARTER et al., Bio/Technology, (19920000), vol. 10, pages 163 - 167 | - P. HOLLIGER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - PLUCKTHUN, The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibodies, pringer Verlag, (19940000), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315 | - HUSTON, J. S. et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A, (19880000), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Science, Mark Publishing Company | - LANGER et al., J. Biomed. Mater. Res., (19810000), vol. 15, pages 167 - 277 | - LANGER, Chem. Tech., (19820000), vol. 12, pages 98 - 105 | - SIDMAN et al., Biopolymers, (19830000), vol. 22, pages 547 - 556 |