EP2695337 - A METHOD FOR TRAFFIC LOAD BALANCING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou H3C Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Hangzhou Manufacturing Base 310 Liuhe Road Zhijiang Hi-Tech Park Hangzhou Hi-Tech Industry Development Zone Hangzhou Zhejiang 310053 / CN | [2014/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Wei Room 730 Oriental Electronic Building No. 2 Chuangye Road Shangdi Information Industry Base Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | Rees, Simon John Lewis, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [2014/07] | Application number, filing date | 12768617.8 | 06.04.2012 | WO2012CN00454 | Priority number, date | CN2011186357 | 06.04.2011 Original published format: CN201110086357 | [2014/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012136078 | Date: | 11.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2695337 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.10.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/70 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
H04L47/125 (EP,US);
H04L45/245 (EP,US);
H04L45/586 (EP,US);
H04L47/29 (EP,US);
H04L47/41 (EP,US);
Y02D30/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/07] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERKEHRSLASTENAUSGLEICH | [2014/07] | English: | A METHOD FOR TRAFFIC LOAD BALANCING | [2014/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉQUILIBRAGE DE CHARGE DE TRAFIC | [2014/07] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 24.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/01] | 18.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2005025179 (MCLAGGAN DOUGLAS [GB], et al) [I] 1-3,5-9,11,12 * paragraphs [0055] , [0056] , [0058] * [A] 4,10; | [A]WO2009045130 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 9 * | [T] - ROGER LAPUH NETWORK WORKING GROUP DINESH MOHAN RICHARD MCGOVERN NORTEL, "Split Multi-link Trunking (SMLT); draft-lapuh-network-smlt-08.txt", SPLIT MULTI-LINK TRUNKING (SMLT); DRAFT-LAPUH-NETWORK-SMLT-08.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20080707), no. 8, XP015059390 [T] 1-12 * paragraph [3.SMLT.operation]; figure 2 * | International search | [XP]CN102118319 (H3C TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD); | [A]CN101815007 (H3C TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD); | [A]CN101610283 (LANGCHAO ELECTRONIC INF IND [CN]); | [A]KR20040074680 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) |