EP2766429 - STABILIZED POLYAMIDE/ABS MOLDING MASSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Styrolution Europe GmbH Erlenstraße 2 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states Styrolution GmbH Erlenstraße 2 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINKWITZ, Rolf Uhlandstr.12 68167 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
BLINZLER, Marko Rheindammstr.54 68163 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
VON BENTEN, Rebekka D3, Nr.4 68159 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
CHAROENSIRISOMBOON, Piyada Hans Bühl Str. 16 67251 Freinsheim / DE | [2014/41] |
Former [2014/34] | 01 /
MINKWITZ, Rolf Uhlandstr.12 68167 Mannheim / DE | ||
02 /
BLINZLER, Marko Rheindammstr.54 68163 Mannheim / DE | |||
03 /
VON BENTEN, Rebekka D3, Nr.4 68159 Mannheim / DE | |||
04 /
CHAROENSIRISOMBOON, Piyada Richard-Wagner-Str.25 68165 Mannheim / DE | Representative(s) | Jacobi, Markus Alexander Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Jacobi, Markus Alexander Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 12768855.4 | 05.10.2012 | WO2012EP69742 | Priority number, date | EP20110185103 | 13.10.2011 Original published format: EP 11185103 | [2014/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013053649 | Date: | 18.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2766429 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08L55/02, C08L77/00, C08L25/12, C08K5/17, C08L25/14, C08K5/3492, C08K5/3435 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
C08L77/02 (EP,US);
C08K5/3435 (EP,US);
C08K5/34926 (EP,US);
C08L25/08 (EP,US);
C08L55/02 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (EP,US);
C08L77/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L55/02, C08K5/3435, C08K5/34926, C08L25/08, C08L77/00 (US,EP);
C08L55/02, C08K5/3435, C08K5/34926, C08L25/08, C08L77/02 (EP,US);
C08L55/02, C08K5/3435, C08K5/34926, C08L25/08, C08L77/06 (EP,US);
C08L77/00, C08K5/3435, C08K5/34926, C08L25/08, C08L55/02 (EP,US);
C08L77/02, C08K5/3435, C08K5/34926, C08L25/08, C08L55/02 (US,EP);
C08L77/06, C08K5/3435, C08K5/34926, C08L25/08, C08L55/02 (US,EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/34] | Title | German: | STABILISIERTE POLYAMID-ABS FORMMASSEN | [2014/34] | English: | STABILIZED POLYAMIDE/ABS MOLDING MASSES | [2014/34] | French: | MATIÈRES À MOULER EN POLYAMIDE/ABS STABILISÉES | [2014/34] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 12.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/40] | 30.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1338622 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH]) [Y] 1-15 * tables 1, 2 *; | [Y]WO2005040281 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * examples 2-8, 10 * * page 26, line 41 - page 27, line 2 *; | [A]WO2010089258 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* table 1 * | by applicant | DE1260135 | EP0038094 | EP0038582 | EP0039524 | US4331586 | EP0062901 | DE3149358 | US4396769 | EP0093693 | EP0129195 | EP0129196 | EP0202214 | US4692486 | EP0402528 | US5208132 | DE4407485 | WO9528443 | EP0782994 | EP0784080 | DE19728629 | WO9941297 | DE19812135 | DE10024935 | EP1263855 | DE10316198 | WO2005040281 | WO2005071013 | - W. WOHLLEBEN; H. SCHUCH, Measurement of Particle Size Distribution of Polymer Latexes, (2010), pages 130 - 153 | - CARLSSON, Journal of Polymer Science, Polymer Chemistry, vol. 20, pages 575 - 82 |