|
27.01.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.01.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.09.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2015 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
09.09.2015 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.12.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2014 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.04.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
31.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
18.11.2013 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
18.11.2013 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.09.2013 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.07.2013 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
23.07.2013 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
23.07.2013 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.04.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
01.02.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
01.02.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.02.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |