|
09.05.2019 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2018 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.11.2018 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2018 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2018 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2018 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2018 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2018 |
OPPODREX with handwritten amendments |
Opposition |
19 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.03.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
06.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.09.2017 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.09.2017 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.05.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
25 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
40 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
45 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
59 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
66 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
58 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
145 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.08.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2014 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2014 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.03.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.03.2013 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
24 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |