19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
28.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
22.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] |
22.07.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
04.03.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
22.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
14.08.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] |
01.08.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.08.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
31.07.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
24.07.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
31.03.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.03.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] |
20.03.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] |
05.12.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
19.11.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.07.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
04.07.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
10.04.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.04.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.04.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.10.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|