EP2761254 - METHOD FOR CONTACTLESS MEASUREMENT OF A RELATIVE POSITION BY MEANS OF A HALL SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TE Connectivity Germany GmbH Ampèrestraße 12-14 64625 Bensheim / DE | [2015/35] |
Former [2014/32] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics AMP GmbH Ampèrestrasse 12-14 64625 Bensheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAAF, Oliver Obere Hauptstrasse 128 Lustadt / DE | [2014/32] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/38] |
Former [2014/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12769364.6 | 25.09.2012 | [2015/38] | WO2012EP68842 | Priority number, date | DE201110115302 | 29.09.2011 Original published format: DE102011115302 | [2014/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013045430 | Date: | 04.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2761254 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2761254 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/07, G01B7/14, G01D5/14, G01D5/244 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
G01D5/145 (EP,US);
G01R33/07 (US);
G01B7/14 (US);
G01D5/2448 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/32] | G01D5/14, G01D5/244 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BERÜHRUNGSLOSEN MESSEN EINER RELATIVEN POSITION MITTELS EINES HALLSENSORS | [2014/32] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTACTLESS MEASUREMENT OF A RELATIVE POSITION BY MEANS OF A HALL SENSOR | [2014/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR MESURE SANS CONTACT D'UNE POSITION RELATIVE AU MOYEN D'UN CAPTEUR À EFFET HALL | [2014/32] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 14.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.09.2012 | AL | 16.09.2015 | AT | 16.09.2015 | BG | 16.09.2015 | CY | 16.09.2015 | CZ | 16.09.2015 | DK | 16.09.2015 | EE | 16.09.2015 | ES | 16.09.2015 | FI | 16.09.2015 | HR | 16.09.2015 | IT | 16.09.2015 | LT | 16.09.2015 | LV | 16.09.2015 | MC | 16.09.2015 | MK | 16.09.2015 | MT | 16.09.2015 | NL | 16.09.2015 | PL | 16.09.2015 | RO | 16.09.2015 | RS | 16.09.2015 | SE | 16.09.2015 | SI | 16.09.2015 | SK | 16.09.2015 | SM | 16.09.2015 | TR | 16.09.2015 | IE | 25.09.2015 | LU | 25.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | NO | 16.12.2015 | GR | 17.12.2015 | IS | 16.01.2016 | PT | 18.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 25.09.2012 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BG | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
TR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.09.2015 | ||
LU | 25.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 25.09.2012 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BG | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.09.2015 | ||
LU | 25.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 25.09.2012 | |
AT | 16.09.2015 | ||
BG | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 16.09.2015 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
IT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 16.09.2015 | |
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 16.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0115391 (TRW INC [US]) [A] 1-15* pages 3-22 *; | [YA]US4737710 (VAN ANTWERP JOEL C [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,8,9,13-15 * column 2, line 21 - column 12, line 27 * [A] 6,7,10-12; | [YDA]EP1243897 (SENTRON AG [CH]) [YD] 1-5,8,9,13-15 * pages 2-6 * [A] 6,7,10-12; | [YA]WO2007092402 (CALIFORNIA LINEAR DEVICES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,8,9,13-15 * pages 13-37 * [A] 6,7,10-12; | [A]US2011227567 (REIDMUELLER KURT [AT], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0061] * | by applicant | EP1243897 | EP0979988 | EP2159546 |