EP2737211 - METHOD FOR ACCURATE AND LOW-CONSUMPTION MEMS MICROPUMP ACTUATION AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Debiotech S.A. Av. de Sévelin 28 1004 Lausanne / CH | [2014/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAPPEL, Eric 43 Rue du Mont Chanais F-01210 Versonnex / FR | [2014/23] | Representative(s) | Weihs, Bruno Konrad André Roland SA IP Attorneys & Services Avenue Collonges 21 1004 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Weihs, Bruno Konrad ANDRE ROLAND SA P.O. Box 5107 1002 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 12769478.4 | 27.07.2012 | WO2012IB53847 | Priority number, date | EP20110176003 | 29.07.2011 Original published format: EP 11176003 | [2014/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013018011 | Date: | 07.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2737211 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/02, F04B43/04, A61M5/142 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
F04B43/046 (EP,US);
A61M5/14224 (EP,US);
F04B19/006 (US);
F04B43/02 (US);
F04B43/043 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BETÄTIGUNG EINER PRÄZISEN MEMS-MIKROPUMPE MIT NIEDRIGEM VERBRAUCH UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS | [2014/23] | English: | METHOD FOR ACCURATE AND LOW-CONSUMPTION MEMS MICROPUMP ACTUATION AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | [2014/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ACTIONNEMENT D'UNE MICRO-POMPE MEMS PRÉCISE ET À BASSE CONSOMMATION, ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA MISE EN OELIGUVRE DUDIT PROCÉDÉ | [2014/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 24.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 23.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1403519 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]); | [A]US2006097206 (ELDRIDGE JEROME M [US]); | [A]US2009097037 (CHAPPEL ERIC [FR]); | [A]US2009099523 (GRANT KEVIN L [US], et al); | [A]WO2010046728 (DEBIOTECH SA [CH], et al) | by applicant | US5759014 | EP1403519 | US2006027523 | WO2010046728 |