EP2741847 - NOVEL METHOD FOR DESTABILISING A PICKERING EMULSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment le Ponant D 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2014/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALLOGGI, Florent 65 rue du Moulin des Prés F-75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
THILL, Antoine 55 rue la Fontaine F-92260 Fontenay aux Roses / FR | 03 /
FOUILLOUX, Sarah 25 rue du bas mesnil F-60240 Le Mesnil Théribus / FR | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/20] | Gevers & Orès 41 avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2014/25] | Mena, Sandra Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12769487.5 | 09.08.2012 | [2017/20] | WO2012IB54067 | Priority number, date | FR20110057303 | 11.08.2011 Original published format: FR 1157303 | [2014/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013021362 | Date: | 14.02.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2741847 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2741847 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01F17/00, B01D17/04 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
B01D17/047 (EP,US);
C09K23/002 (EP,US);
C08F122/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUES VERFAHREN ZUR DESTABILISIERUNG EINER PICKERING-EMULSION | [2014/25] | English: | NOVEL METHOD FOR DESTABILISING A PICKERING EMULSION | [2014/25] | French: | NOUVEAU PROCÉDÉ DE DÉSTABILISATION D'UNE ÉMULSION DE PICKERING | [2014/25] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 08.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 10.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.08.2012 | AL | 17.05.2017 | AT | 17.05.2017 | CY | 17.05.2017 | CZ | 17.05.2017 | DK | 17.05.2017 | EE | 17.05.2017 | ES | 17.05.2017 | FI | 17.05.2017 | HR | 17.05.2017 | IT | 17.05.2017 | LT | 17.05.2017 | LV | 17.05.2017 | MC | 17.05.2017 | MK | 17.05.2017 | MT | 17.05.2017 | NL | 17.05.2017 | PL | 17.05.2017 | PT | 17.05.2017 | RO | 17.05.2017 | RS | 17.05.2017 | SE | 17.05.2017 | SI | 17.05.2017 | SK | 17.05.2017 | SM | 17.05.2017 | TR | 17.05.2017 | IE | 09.08.2017 | LU | 09.08.2017 | BG | 17.08.2017 | NO | 17.08.2017 | GR | 18.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | IS | 17.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 09.08.2012 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MK | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PT | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.08.2017 | ||
LU | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 09.08.2012 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MK | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.08.2017 | ||
LU | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 09.08.2012 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MK | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.08.2017 | ||
LU | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 09.08.2012 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.08.2017 | ||
LU | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.08.2012 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.08.2017 | ||
LU | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.08.2017 | ||
LU | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.08.2017 | ||
LU | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
IE | 09.08.2017 | ||
LU | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A] - FUJII ET AL, "Hydroxyapatite nanoparticles as stimulus-responsive particulate emulsifiers and building block for porous materials", JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, ACADEMIC PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20070918), vol. 315, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JCIS.2007.06.071, ISSN 0021-9797, pages 287 - 296, XP022258540 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcis.2007.06.071 | [A] - FREDRICK E ET AL, "Factors governing partial coalescence in oil-in-water emulsions", ADVANCES IN COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 153, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.CIS.2009.10.003, ISSN 0001-8686, (20100115), pages 30 - 42, (20091024), XP026887243 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cis.2009.10.003 | [A] - YANG ET AL, "Effect of dispersion pH on the formation and stability of Pickering emulsions stabilized by layered double hydroxides particles", JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, ACADEMIC PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20061223), vol. 306, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JCIS.2006.10.062, ISSN 0021-9797, pages 285 - 295, XP005733261 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcis.2006.10.062 | [A] - C. P. WHITBY ET AL., "Shear-induced coalescnece of oil-in-water Pickering emulsions", JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, (20110523), vol. 361, pages 170 - 177, XP002672531 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.JCIS.2011.05.046 | by applicant | - D. E. TAMBE ET AL., JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 162, pages 1 - 10 | - AVEYARD ET AL., PHYS. CHEM. CHEM. PHYS., (2003), vol. 5, pages 2398 - 2409 | - HWANG ET AL., ELECTROPHORESIS, (2010), vol. 31, pages 850 - 859 | - MELLE ET AL., LANGMUIR, (2005), vol. 21, pages 2158 - 2162 | - XIA ET AL., JOURNAL OF MACROMOLECULER SCIENCE, PART A : PURE AND APPLIED CHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 43, pages 71 - 81 | - FUJII ET AL., ADV. MATER., (20050418), vol. 17, no. 8 | - SUBRAMANIAM ET AL., NATURE, (200512), vol. 438, no. 15 | - STUDART ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM. B, (2009), vol. 113, no. 12 | - ANNA ET AL., APPL. PHYS. LETT., (20030120), vol. 82, no. 3 | - UMBANHOWAR ET AL., LANGMUIR, (2000), vol. 16, no. 2 | - KOBAYASHI ET AL., COLLOIDS AND SURFACES A : PHYSICOCHEM. ENG. ASPECTS, (2007), vol. 296, pages 285 - 289 | - MALLOGI ET AL., APPL. PHYS. LETT., (201001), vol. 82, no. 3, page 20 |