|
13.10.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.10.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
64 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
65 |
|
12.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.03.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.02.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.02.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.10.2019 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.10.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.09.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.09.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
15 |
|
08.04.2014 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.04.2014 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
08.04.2014 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.04.2014 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
03.04.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
24.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.10.2013 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
29.10.2013 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
30.05.2013 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.05.2013 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
03.05.2013 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
25.04.2013 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
25.04.2013 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.04.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
72 |
|
23.04.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
78 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
69 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
08.10.2012 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.10.2012 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
08.10.2012 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
40 |
|
08.10.2012 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
18 |
|
08.10.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |