EP2756544 - OPEN CIRCUIT COMMON JUNCTION FEED FOR DUPLEXER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2015/19] |
Former [2014/30] | For all designated states Powerwave Technologies S.a.r.l. 296-298 Route de Longwy 1940 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUBEDI, Purna, C. 1801 East Saint Andrew Place Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | 02 /
SHEIKH, Khurram, Parviz 1801 East Saint Andrew Place Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | [2014/30] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | Betten & Resch Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12770331.2 | 04.09.2012 | WO2012US53676 | Priority number, date | US201161531306P | 06.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161531306 P | [2014/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013036485 | Date: | 14.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2756544 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01P1/213 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
H01P1/2136 (EP,US);
H01P1/208 (US);
H01P1/20 (US);
H01P1/202 (US);
H01P7/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/30] | Title | German: | SPEISUNG MIT GEMEINSAMEM ÜBERGANG MIT OFFENEM KREISLAUF FÜR DUPLEXER | [2014/30] | English: | OPEN CIRCUIT COMMON JUNCTION FEED FOR DUPLEXER | [2014/30] | French: | ALIMENTATION À JONCTION COMMUNE À CIRCUIT OUVERT POUR DUPLEXEUR | [2014/30] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/30] | 17.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/35] | 26.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2001030587 (WULFF TORSTEN R [US]) [X] 1-3,7-15,18-24,27,28 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] , [0017]; figures 3,4 *; | [XY]US2002145490 (SAUDER DAVID D [US], et al) [X] 13,14,16,17,22,23,25,26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0030] , [0034] , [0036] , [0040]; figures 1,2,4-6 * [Y] 4-6,16,17,25,26; | [XY]US2004222868 (RATHGEBER ROLAND [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,8-15,19-24,28 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] - [0031]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 4-6,16,17,25,26; | [X]US2009153264 (TANPO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,8-15,19-24,28 * abstract ** paragraphs [0049] - [0052]; figures 1-3 * |