|
26.08.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.09.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
77 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
77 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.04.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2019 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2019 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.03.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.03.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
06.03.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.03.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.03.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
06.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.08.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2014 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
31.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.02.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.04.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
143 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
92 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
17 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
58 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
16 |