EP2771256 - CONTAINER FOR PACKAGING A FIRST AND A SECOND FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cadorit AG Rieserstrasse 8 Canton de Bale Campagne 4132 Muttenz Basel Landshaft / CH | [2014/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEBILLE, Vincent 7 Rue Sain Martin F-91150 Etampes / FR | 02 /
GUILLON, Bruno 79 Boulevard du Périer F-06400 Cannes / FR | [2014/36] | Representative(s) | de Zeeuw, Johan Diederick Murgitroyd & Company 55 Allee Pierre Ziller CS50105 06902 Valbonne Sophia-Antipolis / FR | [2014/36] | Application number, filing date | 12772298.1 | 05.10.2012 | [2016/01] | WO2012EP69805 | Priority number, date | FR20110059703 | 26.10.2011 Original published format: FR 1159703 | [2014/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013060566 | Date: | 02.05.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2771256 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2771256 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/32 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
B65D81/3222 (EP,US);
B65D1/40 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER ZUR VERKAPSELUNG EINER ERSTEN UND ZWEITEN FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2014/36] | English: | CONTAINER FOR PACKAGING A FIRST AND A SECOND FLUID | [2014/36] | French: | RECIPIENT POUR EMBALLER UN PREMIER ET UN DEUXIEME FLUIDE | [2014/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 25.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 23.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2012 | AL | 30.12.2015 | BG | 30.12.2015 | CY | 30.12.2015 | EE | 30.12.2015 | ES | 30.12.2015 | HR | 30.12.2015 | LT | 30.12.2015 | LV | 30.12.2015 | MK | 30.12.2015 | RO | 30.12.2015 | RS | 30.12.2015 | SE | 30.12.2015 | SI | 30.12.2015 | SK | 30.12.2015 | SM | 30.12.2015 | NO | 30.03.2016 | GR | 31.03.2016 | IS | 30.04.2016 | PT | 02.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 05.10.2012 | |
BG | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 05.10.2012 | |
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | EE | 30.12.2015 | |
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | EE | 30.12.2015 | |
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | EE | 30.12.2015 | |
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | HR | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | HR | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 30.12.2015 | |
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 30.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2724519 (HENKEL KGAA) [A] 1-9 * page 10, line 16 - page 12, line 4; figures 1-2 *; | [A]EP1481921 (GENESCA ROMEU ISIDRO [ES]) [A] 1-9* column 6, line 23; figure 1 *; | [A]US2007215496 (SCARBOROUGH ELLA B [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0030]; figures 1, 4-5 * | by applicant | US4103772 | US4103722 |