EP2764651 - DATA PACKET TRANSMISSION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus DS SAS ZAC de la Clef Saint Pierre 1 Boulevard Jean Moulin 78990 Elancourt / FR | For all designated states Cassidian Finland Oy Hiomotie 32 00380 Helsinki / FI | [2018/34] |
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states Airbus DS SAS ZAC de la Clef Saint Pierre 1 Boulevard Jean Moulin 78990 Elancourt / FR | ||
For all designated states Cassidian Finland Oy Hiomotie 32 00380 Helsinki / FI | |||
Former [2014/33] | For all designated states Cassidian SAS 1 Boulevard Jean Moulin ZAC de la Clef Saint Pierre 78990 Elancourt / FR | ||
For all designated states Cassidian Finland Oy Hiomotie 32 00380 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEGE, Philippe 3 Rue des Rosiers 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | 02 /
MOLKO, Christophe 11 rue Edmond Michelet 78450 Villepreux / FR | 03 /
MOUFFRON, Marc 16 Rue Lamartine 78470 Saint Remy Les Chevreuses / FR | 04 /
BRUTEL, Christophe Lukiotie 1 D 2710 Espoo 71 / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/33] | 01 /
MEGE, Philippe 3 Rue des Rosiers 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | ||
02 /
MOLKO, Christophe 5 Rue d'Armagnac 78450 Villepreux / FR | |||
03 /
MOUFFRON, Marc 16 Rue Lamartine 78470 Saint Remy Les Chevreuses / FR | |||
04 /
BRUTEL, Christophe Lukiotie 1 D 2710 Espoo 71 / FI | Representative(s) | Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 25 rue de Maubeuge 75009 Paris / FR | [2018/34] |
Former [2014/33] | Bringer, Mathieu, et al GEVERS FRANCE 9, rue Saint Antoine du T 31000 Toulouse / FR | Application number, filing date | 12772758.4 | 05.10.2012 | [2018/34] | WO2012EP69756 | Priority number, date | FR20110059081 | 07.10.2011 Original published format: FR 1159081 | [2014/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013050550 | Date: | 11.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2764651 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2764651 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18 | [2014/33] | CPC: |
H04L1/1819 (EP,US);
H04L1/18 (US);
H04L1/1845 (EP,US)
| Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENPAKETÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2014/33] | English: | DATA PACKET TRANSMISSION METHOD | [2014/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE PAQUETS DE DONNÉES | [2014/33] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 19.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.03.2018 | 06.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2012 | AL | 22.08.2018 | AT | 22.08.2018 | CY | 22.08.2018 | CZ | 22.08.2018 | DK | 22.08.2018 | EE | 22.08.2018 | HR | 22.08.2018 | IT | 22.08.2018 | LT | 22.08.2018 | LV | 22.08.2018 | MC | 22.08.2018 | MK | 22.08.2018 | NL | 22.08.2018 | PL | 22.08.2018 | PT | 22.08.2018 | RO | 22.08.2018 | RS | 22.08.2018 | SE | 22.08.2018 | SI | 22.08.2018 | SK | 22.08.2018 | SM | 22.08.2018 | TR | 22.08.2018 | IE | 05.10.2018 | LU | 05.10.2018 | MT | 05.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | BG | 22.11.2018 | NO | 22.11.2018 | GR | 23.11.2018 | IS | 22.12.2018 | [2020/31] | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0062467 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 6 - page 7, line 29 * * figures 3,6,7 *; | [A] - NOKIA, "Solution to problem of MAC based ciphering with Type II/III hybrid ARQ", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-99236, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (19990521), vol. RAN WG2, no. Yokohama; 19990521, XP050112534 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - ALCATEL, "Proposal for RLC+MAC ciphering model", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-99375, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (19990520), vol. RAN WG2, no. Berlin; 19990520, XP050112728 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |