Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL230627 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2019 | B | Priority number | Date | DE102011113811 | 20.09.2011 | WO2012EP67935 | 13.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2842527 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2020 | C | CA2842527 | 28.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011113811 | 20.09.2011 | WO2012EP67935 | 13.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012311678B | Global Dossier | 14.05.2015 | B2 | AU2012311678 | 10.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011113811 | 20.09.2011 | WO2012EP67935 | 13.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2758807 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2018 | B1 | EP2758807 | 30.07.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102011113811 | 20.09.2011 | WO2012EP67935 | 13.09.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201400447 | 29.10.2014 | B | Priority number | Date | DE102011113811 | 20.09.2011 | WO2012EP67935 | 13.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013041437 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2013 | A3 | WO2013041437 | 28.03.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102011113811 | 20.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102011113811 | 21.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011113811 | 20.09.2011 |