Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2756319 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2019 | B1 | EP2756319 | 23.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP68180 | 16.09.2012 | GB201116091 | 16.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013037986 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201116091 | 16.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201116091D0 | 02.11.2011 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201116091 | 16.09.2011 |