EP2758513 - MODIFIED GRAM POSITIVE BACTERIA AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intrexon Actobiotics NV Industriepark Zwijnaarde 7 C building D 9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | [2018/20] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states Intrexon Actobiotics NV Technologiepark 4 9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | ||
Former [2016/02] | For all designated states Intrexon Actobiotics NV Technologiepark 4 9052 Zwijnaarde / NL | ||
Former [2014/31] | For all designated states Actogenix N.V. Technologiepark 4 9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEIDLER, Lothar Bokslaarstraat 41 B-9160 Lokeren / BE | 02 /
VAN HUYNEGEM, Karolien Acaciastraat 44 B-9890 Asper / BE | 03 /
VANDENBROUCKE, Klaas Bachtenboslaan 5 B- 9840 De Pinte / BE | [2014/31] | Representative(s) | Pohlman, Sandra M., et al df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [2018/20] |
Former [2014/31] | Michalík, Andrej, et al De Clercq & Partners cvba E. Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | Application number, filing date | 12773253.5 | 21.09.2012 | [2018/20] | WO2012EP68634 | Priority number, date | EP20110182643 | 23.09.2011 Original published format: EP 11182643 | [2014/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013041673 | Date: | 28.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2758513 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2758513 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/04, A61K39/09 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
A23C9/1234 (EP,US);
C12N1/04 (EP,RU,US);
C12N1/20 (US);
A23K10/18 (EP,US);
A23L33/135 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K14/315 (EP,US);
C12N15/52 (RU);
C12N9/1051 (EP,US);
C12N9/16 (EP,US);
C12P19/12 (EP,US);
A23V2400/11 (EP,US);
A23V2400/51 (EP,US);
A61K2039/523 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (US);
C12R2001/01 (US);
C12R2001/225 (US);
C12Y204/01216 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTE GRAM-POSITIVE BAKTERIEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2014/31] | English: | MODIFIED GRAM POSITIVE BACTERIA AND USES THEREOF | [2014/31] | French: | BACTÉRIES GRAM POSITIF MODIFIÉES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2014/31] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 26.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18172371.9 / EP3382006 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 16.05.2018 | CY | 16.05.2018 | CZ | 16.05.2018 | EE | 16.05.2018 | FI | 16.05.2018 | HR | 16.05.2018 | LT | 16.05.2018 | LV | 16.05.2018 | MC | 16.05.2018 | MK | 16.05.2018 | PL | 16.05.2018 | PT | 16.05.2018 | RO | 16.05.2018 | RS | 16.05.2018 | SI | 16.05.2018 | SK | 16.05.2018 | SM | 16.05.2018 | TR | 16.05.2018 | BG | 16.08.2018 | NO | 16.08.2018 | GR | 17.08.2018 | IS | 16.09.2018 | LU | 21.09.2018 | MT | 21.09.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MK | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
LU | 21.09.2018 | ||
MT | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
LU | 21.09.2018 | ||
MT | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
LU | 21.09.2018 | ||
MT | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
LU | 21.09.2018 | ||
MT | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
LU | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
LU | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CZ | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 16.05.2018 | |
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 16.05.2018 | |
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 16.05.2018 | |
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 16.05.2018 | |
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | Cited in | by applicant | WO9611277 | US5559007 | WO9714806 | WO0023471 | WO0102570 | EP1116849 | EP1117358 | WO0194585 | WO02090551 | WO2004046346 | US6790444 | WO2005111194 | WO2006018446 | WO2007025977 | WO2007063075 | WO2007128757 | WO2008071751 | WO2008084115 | WO2008090223 | WO2010034844 | WO2010124855 |