EP2709596 - EFFERVESCENT FORMULATIONS COMPRISING DEXKETOPROFEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bilgic, Mahmut Yildiz Teknik Universitesi Davutpasa Kampusu Teknoloji Gelistirme Bolgesi D Blok 34220 Esenler-Istanbul / TR | [2014/45] |
Former [2014/13] | For all designated states Bilgic, Mahmut Tozkoparan Mah. General Ali Riza Gurcan Cad. Merter IsMerkezi Bagimsiz Bolum No:2/13 Merter Istanbul 34173 / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/13] | Application number, filing date | 12775064.4 | 14.05.2012 | WO2012TR00083 | Priority number, date | TR20110004864 | 18.05.2011 Original published format: TR 201104864 | TR20120005008 | 30.04.2012 Original published format: TR 201205008 | TR20120005317 | 08.05.2012 Original published format: TR 201205317 | [2014/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013006146 | Date: | 10.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2709596 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K9/46, A61K31/192 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
A61K9/0007 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (US);
A61K31/133 (EP,US);
A61K31/166 (EP,US);
A61K31/192 (EP,US);
A61K31/197 (EP,US);
A61K31/223 (EP,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/192, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Title | German: | BRAUSEFORMULIERUNGEN MIT DEXKETOPROFEN | [2014/13] | English: | EFFERVESCENT FORMULATIONS COMPRISING DEXKETOPROFEN | [2014/13] | French: | PRÉPARATIONS EFFERVESCENTES CONTENANT DU DEXKÉTOPROFÈNE | [2014/13] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 18.07.2014 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 06.10.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 30.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/13] | 12.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2018 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability | 10.12.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 10.12.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2016 | Decision despatched | 10.12.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 10.12.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.01.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO02098388 (BOOTS CO PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-19,30 * page 5, lines 21-24 ** examples 21-22 *; | [Y]US2010204259 (TYGESEN PETER HOLM [DK], et al) [Y] 1,4-29 * page 3, paragraph 0035 * * page 5, paragraphs 0067-0070 * * page 6, paragraph 0075 * * page 8, paragraphs 0098-0102 * * examples 1, 5-7, 9-24 *; | [XY] - Anonymous, "DEXMOL", internet citation, (20101220), URL: http://www.iegm.gov.tr/Folders/KubKT/Yeni%20%C4%B0la%C3%A7%20%C5%9Eube%20M%C3%BCd%C3%BCrl%C3%BC%C4%9F%C3%BC/2010.12.20_Dexmol%2025%20mg%20KUB_209e441.pdf, (20121102), XP055042987 [X] 1-19,31 * pages 1, 7, 14 * [Y] 1-30 | by applicant | EP0668851 |