EP2745540 - METHOD OF NOTIFYING MBMS SERVICE INFORMATION OF A NEIGHBORING CELL AND CORRESPONDING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2014/26] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, He 388 Ningqiao RD Shanghai 201206 / CN | 02 /
WORRALL, Chandrika 11A Balfour Crescent Newbury Berkshire RG14 6SN / GB | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/47] |
Former [2014/26] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Gerokstrasse 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 12775291.3 | 31.07.2012 | [2021/47] | WO2012IB01568 | Priority number, date | CN201110233473 | 15.08.2011 Original published format: CN201110233473 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013024334 | Date: | 21.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2745540 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2745540 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2745540 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/06, H04W76/40, // H04W48/12 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
H04W4/06 (EP,US);
H04B7/2603 (KR);
H04W68/005 (US);
H04W76/40 (EP,US);
H04W48/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/26] | H04W4/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MELDUNG VON MBMS-DIENSTINFORMATIONEN EINER BENACHBARTEN ZELLE UND ENTSPRECHENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2014/26] | English: | METHOD OF NOTIFYING MBMS SERVICE INFORMATION OF A NEIGHBORING CELL AND CORRESPONDING APPARATUS | [2014/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE NOTIFICATION D'INFORMATION DE SERVICE MBMS D'UNE CELLULE VOISINE ET APPAREIL CORRESPONDANT | [2022/08] |
Former [2014/26] | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION D'INFORMATIONS DE SERVICE MBMS RELATIVES À UNE CELLULE VOISINE, ET APPAREIL CORRESPONDANT | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 22.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2012 | AL | 24.11.2021 | AT | 24.11.2021 | CY | 24.11.2021 | CZ | 24.11.2021 | DK | 24.11.2021 | EE | 24.11.2021 | ES | 24.11.2021 | FI | 24.11.2021 | HR | 24.11.2021 | IT | 24.11.2021 | LT | 24.11.2021 | LV | 24.11.2021 | MC | 24.11.2021 | MK | 24.11.2021 | MT | 24.11.2021 | NL | 24.11.2021 | PL | 24.11.2021 | RO | 24.11.2021 | RS | 24.11.2021 | SE | 24.11.2021 | SI | 24.11.2021 | SK | 24.11.2021 | SM | 24.11.2021 | TR | 24.11.2021 | BG | 24.02.2022 | NO | 24.02.2022 | GR | 25.02.2022 | IS | 24.03.2022 | PT | 24.03.2022 | BE | 31.07.2022 | CH | 31.07.2022 | IE | 31.07.2022 | LI | 31.07.2022 | LU | 31.07.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 31.07.2012 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CY | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
MK | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
TR | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
IE | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
LU | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 31.07.2012 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CY | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
MK | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
IE | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
LU | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 31.07.2012 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CY | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
IE | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
LU | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 31.07.2012 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
IE | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
LU | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
IE | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
LU | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
LU | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
LU | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 24.02.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2011149827 (NA JEEHYEON [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,9-12,17-20,25-28 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0088] *; | [XI] - HUAWEI ET AL, "(Re)Selecting appropriate frequency/cell for service continuity", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-113187 (RE)SELECTING APPROPRIATE FREQUENCY CELL FOR SERVICE CONTINUITY, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110503), vol. RAN WG2, no. Barcelona, Spain; 20110509, pages 1 - 7, XP050495357 [X] 1-4,6-12,14-20,22-28,30-32 * page 1 - page 2 * * page 6 * [I] 5,13,21,29 | [X] - ALCATEL-LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL ET AL, "Enhancement of cell reselection for MBMS service continuity", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-112230, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110404), vol. RAN WG2, no. Shanghai, China; 20110411, pages 1 - 4, XP050494395 [X] 1-4,9-12,17-20,25-28 * page 1 - page 3 * | [A] - "LTE; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA) and Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN); Overall description; Stage 2 (3GPP TS 36.300 version 10.4.0 Release 10)", TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20110601), vol. 3GPP RAN 2, no. V10.4.0, XP014066386 [A] 1-32 * page 56 - page 57 * * page 102 - page 119 * | [XP] - ALCATEL-LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL ET AL, "Neighbouring cell MBMS service information for service continuity", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-114280, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110815), vol. RAN WG2, no. Athens, Greece; 20110822, pages 1 - 2, XP050539734 [XP] 1-32 * page 1 - page 2 * |