EP2756736 - DIMMABLE LED LIGHT FIXTURE HAVING ADJUSTABLE COLOR TEMPERATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABL IP Holding LLC 1170 Peachtree Street NE, Suite 2300 Atlanta, GA 30309 / US | [2018/08] |
Former [2017/02] | For all designated states ABL IP Holding LLC 1 Acuity Way Decatur, GA 30035 / US | ||
Former [2014/30] | For all designated states Juno Manufacturing, LLC 1300 South Wolf Road Des Plaines, Illinois 60017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BADDELA, Srinivasa, M. 49 Colonial Court Streamwood, Illinois 60107 / US | 02 /
SERRA, John, G. 2661 Cameron Drive Hampshire, Illinois 60140 / US | 03 /
GIELNIEWSKI, Michael 1113 Independence Drive Bartlett, Illinois 60103 / US | [2014/30] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | Zerbi, Guido Maria, et al Murgitroyd & Company Piazza Borromeo, 12 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 12775344.0 | 12.09.2012 | WO2012US54838 | Priority number, date | US201113230537 | 12.09.2011 Original published format: US201113230537 | [2014/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013040019 | Date: | 21.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2756736 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
H05B45/3577 (EP,US);
H05B45/20 (EP,US);
H05B45/3725 (EP,US);
H05B45/395 (EP);
H05B47/10 (EP,US);
Y02B20/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/30] | Title | German: | DIMMBARE LED-BELEICHTUNG MIT EINSTELLBARER FARBTEMPERATUR | [2014/30] | English: | DIMMABLE LED LIGHT FIXTURE HAVING ADJUSTABLE COLOR TEMPERATURE | [2014/30] | French: | APPAREIL LUMINEUX À DEL À GRADATION RÉGLABLE OFFRANT UNE TEMPÉRATURE DE COULEUR RÉGLABLE | [2014/30] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/30] | 15.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/27] | 28.05.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.10.2019 | 02.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006202915 (CHIKUGAWA HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0052]; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US2008224631 (MELANSON JOHN L [US]) [A] 1* paragraph [0035]; figure 5 *; | [XI]WO2010103480 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * page 2, line 19 - line 22 * * page 3, line 12 - line 16 * * page 7, line 6 - line 10; figures 1A-1D * * page 7, line 11 - page 8, line 25; figures 2A,2B * * page 8, line 26 - page 10, line 9; figures 3A,3B * [I] 4,6-23 | Examination | WO2013082609 | EP2814068 | by applicant | US7288902 |