EP2756716 - METHODS AND APPARATUS TO REDUCE POWER CONSUMPTION FOR HARQ DECODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2014/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLINGENBRUNN, Thomas 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
BANISTER, Brian Clarke 5775 MorehouseDrive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
EHSAN, Navid 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 04 /
AYDIN, Levent 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2014/30] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2014/30] | Application number, filing date | 12775347.3 | 14.09.2012 | [2018/27] | WO2012US55272 | Priority number, date | US201161534809P | 14.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161534809 P | US201213613826 | 13.09.2012 Original published format: US201213613826 | [2014/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013040282 | Date: | 21.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2756716 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2756716 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
H04W52/0229 (EP,US);
H04W52/02 (KR);
H04L1/18 (KR);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REDUKTION DES STROMVERBRAUCHS FÜR EINE HARQ-DEKODIERUNG | [2014/30] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS TO REDUCE POWER CONSUMPTION FOR HARQ DECODING | [2014/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE RÉDUIRE LA CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE POUR UN DÉCODAGE DE REQUÊTE DE RÉPÉTITION AUTOMATIQUE HYBRIDE (HARQ) | [2014/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/30] | 27.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.09.2012 | AL | 04.07.2018 | AT | 04.07.2018 | CY | 04.07.2018 | CZ | 04.07.2018 | DK | 04.07.2018 | EE | 04.07.2018 | ES | 04.07.2018 | FI | 04.07.2018 | HR | 04.07.2018 | IT | 04.07.2018 | LT | 04.07.2018 | LV | 04.07.2018 | MC | 04.07.2018 | MK | 04.07.2018 | NL | 04.07.2018 | PL | 04.07.2018 | PT | 04.07.2018 | RO | 04.07.2018 | RS | 04.07.2018 | SE | 04.07.2018 | SI | 04.07.2018 | SK | 04.07.2018 | SM | 04.07.2018 | TR | 04.07.2018 | IE | 14.09.2018 | LU | 14.09.2018 | MT | 14.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | BG | 04.10.2018 | NO | 04.10.2018 | GR | 05.10.2018 | IS | 04.11.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 14.09.2012 | |
AL | 04.07.2018 | ||
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PT | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IE | 14.09.2018 | ||
LU | 14.09.2018 | ||
MT | 14.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IE | 14.09.2018 | ||
LU | 14.09.2018 | ||
MT | 14.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
IE | 14.09.2018 | ||
LU | 14.09.2018 | ||
MT | 14.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
IE | 14.09.2018 | ||
LU | 14.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
IE | 14.09.2018 | ||
LU | 14.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
IE | 14.09.2018 | ||
LU | 14.09.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
IE | 14.09.2018 | ||
LU | 14.09.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
LU | 14.09.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 04.07.2018 | |
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 04.07.2018 | |
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 04.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008186892 (DAMNJANOVIC ALEKSANDAR [US]) [A] 1,13,25,28 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0113] * * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0118]; figures 12-14 *; | [A]US2010097978 (PALANKI RAVI [US], et al) [A] 1,13,25,28 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0071]; figures 1,7 * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0080]; figure 9 *; | [A]US2010208660 (JI BAOWEI [US]) [A] 1,13,25,28 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0049]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2011053657 (JL BAOWEI [US]) [A] 1,13,25,28* paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0014] * |