EP2768895 - POLYMER COMPOUND WITH HEAT ABSORBING CHARACTERISTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/35] | POLYMER COMPOSITION WITH HEAT-ABSORBING PROPERTIES | ||
[2015/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2015/45] |
Former [2014/35] | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERKELENZ, Michael Ringstr. 23 47239 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
WEHRMANN, Rolf Scheiblerstr. 93 47800 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
BOUMANS, Anke Klever Str. 352 47574 Goch / DE | [2014/35] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2014/35] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 12775474.5 | 15.10.2012 | [2016/01] | WO2012EP70423 | Priority number, date | EP20110185674 | 18.10.2011 Original published format: EP 11185674 | [2014/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013057074 | Date: | 25.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2768895 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2768895 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/00, C08K3/04, C08K3/38, C08K5/00, C08L69/00 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
C08K3/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08L69/00 (KR);
G02B1/041 (US);
C08K3/24 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/38 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/105 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMER-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT WÄRME-ABSORBIERENDEN EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2014/35] | English: | POLYMER COMPOUND WITH HEAT ABSORBING CHARACTERISTICS | [2015/34] | French: | COMPOSITION DE POLYMÈRE DOTÉE DE PROPRIÉTÉS ABSORBANT LA CHALEUR | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/35] | POLYMER COMPOSITION WITH HEAT-ABSORBING PROPERTIES | ||
Former [2014/35] | COMPOSITION DE POLYMÈRE À PROPRIÉTÉS D'ABSORPTION DE CHALEUR | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 25.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.10.2012 | AL | 30.12.2015 | BG | 30.12.2015 | CY | 30.12.2015 | CZ | 30.12.2015 | DK | 30.12.2015 | EE | 30.12.2015 | ES | 30.12.2015 | FI | 30.12.2015 | HR | 30.12.2015 | LT | 30.12.2015 | LV | 30.12.2015 | MC | 30.12.2015 | MK | 30.12.2015 | MT | 30.12.2015 | NL | 30.12.2015 | PL | 30.12.2015 | RO | 30.12.2015 | RS | 30.12.2015 | SE | 30.12.2015 | SI | 30.12.2015 | SK | 30.12.2015 | SM | 30.12.2015 | TR | 30.12.2015 | NO | 30.03.2016 | GR | 31.03.2016 | IS | 30.04.2016 | PT | 02.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 15.10.2012 | |
BG | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
MT | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
TR | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 15.10.2012 | |
BG | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
MT | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 15.10.2012 | |
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
MT | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 15.10.2012 | |
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 30.12.2015 | |
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 30.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1865027 (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,7-11 * example 1; table 1 * * paragraph [0015] * [Y] 5,6; | [XY]EP2009057 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [X] 1-4,7-11 * paragraph [0001] * * examples 5,6; table 1 * [Y] 5,6; | [I]WO2007008476 (GEN ELECTRIC [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * page 28, line 6 - page 29, line 15 * * page 1 * * example - *; | [Y]US2011144250 (MEYER ALEXANDER [DE], et al) [Y] 5,6 * example - * * claim 8 * * paragraphs [0088] , [0089] *; | [A]WO2008134517 (SPARTECH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2012080395 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [XP] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3028635 | US2999825 | US3148172 | US2991273 | US3271367 | US4982014 | US2999846 | DE1570703 | DE2063050 | DE2036052 | DE2211956 | DE3832396 | FR1561518 | JPS6162039 | JPS6162040 | JPS61105550 | EP0839623 | WO9615102 | EP0500496 | DE10392543T | EP1559743 | WO2005037932 | JP2006219662 | JP2008024902 | JP2008150548 | WO2009059901 | JP2008214596 | US2005161642 | EP0718354 | US5844028 | EP0728811 | DE1961668 | WO9740092 | EP1342753 | DE10257079 | EP1188792 | EP0110221 | EP0110238 | EP0716919 | US6350512 | US5869185 | EP1308084 | WO2006108520 | US5041313 | DE3121385 | US5391795 | WO2008109072 | EP0570165 | WO2008071363 | DE2804283 | - SCHNELL, Chemistry and Physics ofPolycarbonates, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1964), vol. 9 | - "Polycarbonates", D. FREITAG; U. GRIGO; P.R. MÜLLER; H. NOUVERTNE; BAYER AG, Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, (1988), vol. 11, pages 648 - 718 | - "Polycarbonate", DRES. U. GRIGO; K. KIRCHNER; P.R. MÜLLER, er/Braun, Kunststoff-Handbuch, Band 3/1, Polycarbonate, Polyacetale, Polyester, Celluloseester, CARL HANSER VERLAG, (1992), pages 117 - 299 | - H. TAKEDA; K. ADACHI, J. AM. CERAM. SOC., (2007), vol. 90, pages 4059 - 4061 | - ADACHI ET AL., J. AM. CERAM. SOC., (2008), vol. 91, pages 2897 - 2902 | - ADACHI ET AL., J. AM. CERAM. SOC., (2007), vol. 90, pages 4059 - 4061 | - Ullmanns Enzyklopädie der Technischen Chemie, 4. Aufl.,, vol. 18, pages 378 - 398 | - Kirk-Othmer, 3. Aufl.,, vol. 17, pages 527 - 534 | - Ullmann's Encylopedia of Industrial Chemistry, 5h Edition, VCH, (1991), vol. A18, pages 368 - 426 |