EP2702592 - ENCRYPTED TRANSPORT SOLID-STATE DISK CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LSI Corporation 1320 Ridder Park Dr. San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2014/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAAM, Farbod Michael 10188 Cass Pl Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [2014/10] | Representative(s) | Freeman, Avi Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 12776230.0 | 20.04.2012 | WO2012US34452 | Priority number, date | US201161480518P | 29.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161480518 P | [2014/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012148812 | Date: | 01.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2702592 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.01.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/06, G11C16/22, G06F13/14, G06F21/00 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
G06F12/14 (KR);
G06F12/1408 (US);
G06F13/38 (KR);
G06F21/606 (EP,US);
G06F21/78 (EP,US);
G11C16/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/10] | Title | German: | VERSCHLÜSSELTE TRANSPORTFESTPLATTENSTEUERUNG | [2014/10] | English: | ENCRYPTED TRANSPORT SOLID-STATE DISK CONTROLLER | [2014/10] | French: | CONTRÔLEUR DE DISQUE ÉLECTRONIQUE DE TRANSPORT CRYPTÉ | [2014/10] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/10] | 17.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/14] | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/17] | 24.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2015 | 30.04.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011055664 (BURD GREGORY [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0110] *; | [Y]US2004117642 (MOWERY KEITH R [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0017] *; | [A]US7814316 (HUGHES JAMES P [US], et al) [A] 6 * column 2 *; | [A]WO2005036406 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE], et al) [A] 11 * abstract * * page 8 - page 10 * | International search | [A]US2011055664 (BURD GREGORY [US], et al); | [A]US7706538 (HUGHES JAMES P [US], et al); | [A]US2008205635 (JAQUETTE GLEN ALAN [US], et al); | [A]US2008072070 (LAMACCHIA MICHAEL PHILIP [US], et al) |