EP2701581 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR NON-INVASIVELY MEASURING PHYSIOLOGIC PARAMETERS OF ONE OR MORE SUBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanyi Medical Technology (Hangzhou) Co., Ltd. Room 201-2, Building No.1 1818-2 West Wenyi Road Yuhang Street Yuhang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang / CN | [2019/21] |
Former [2014/10] | For all designated states Tensys Medical, Inc. Suite 100, 5825 Oberlin Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESHBAUGH, Dave 316 East Drive Vista, CA 92083 / US | 02 /
GOEDJE, Oliver Ahornweg 1 D-82064 Strasslach / DE | 03 /
BOHN, Matthias Wilbrechtstrasse 56a D-81477 Munich / DE | [2014/10] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12776593.1 | 27.04.2012 | WO2012US35677 | Priority number, date | US201113098344 | 29.04.2011 Original published format: US201113098344 | [2014/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012149485 | Date: | 01.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2701581 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/02, A61B5/021, A61B5/00 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
A61B5/02141 (EP,US);
A61B5/6824 (EP,US);
A61B5/684 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0406 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/05] | A61B5/02, A61B5/021 | ||
Former IPC [2014/10] | A61B5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/10] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR NICHTINVASIVEN MESSUNG PHYSIOLOGISCHER PARAMETER EINES ODER MEHRERER PATIENTEN | [2014/10] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR NON-INVASIVELY MEASURING PHYSIOLOGIC PARAMETERS OF ONE OR MORE SUBJECTS | [2014/10] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LA MESURE DE MANIÈRE NON INVASIVE DE PARAMÈTRES PHYSIOLOGIQUES D'UN OU PLUSIEURS SUJETS | [2014/10] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2013 | Search fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/48] | 10.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/44] | 14.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   24.10.2017 | 30.04.2018 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2008021334 (FINBURGH SIMON E [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [Y] 11-15; | [Y]US2011009723 (MANNHEIMER PAUL D [US], et al) [Y] 11-15 * paragraph [0032] * | International search | [X]US2008021334 (FINBURGH SIMON E [US], et al); | [Y]US2011009723 (MANNHEIMER PAUL D [US], et al); | [Y]US2006135896 (LATIMER RUSSELL A [US]); | [Y]US2009131806 (FINBURGH SIMON E [US], et al) | Examination | US5642733 | by applicant | US2008021334 |