EP2701482 - DOWN AND/OR UP FORCE ADJUSTMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kinze Manufacturing, Inc. 2171 M Avenue P.O. Box 806 Williamsburg, IA 52361-0806 / US | [2014/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACHEN, Courtney N. 1113 Cambria Court Iowa City, IA 52246 / US | 02 /
BACHMAN, Marvin L. 1631 P Avenue Marengo, IA 52301 / US | 03 /
STEVENSON, Vaughan G. 214 E. South Street Williamsburg, IA 52361 / US | [2018/23] |
Former [2014/10] | 01 /
ACHEN, Courtney, N. 1113 Cambria Court Iowa City, IA 52246 / US | ||
02 /
BACHMAN, Marvin, L. 1631 P Avenue Marengo, IA 52301 / US | |||
03 /
STEVENSON, Vaughan, G. 214 E. South Street Williamsburg, IA 52361 / US | Representative(s) | Tomkinson, Alexandra Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | [2018/23] |
Former [2014/10] | Tomkinson, Alexandra Bailey Walsh & Co 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12776742.4 | 27.04.2012 | [2018/23] | WO2012US35518 | Priority number, date | US201161479537P | 27.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161479537 P | US201161479543P | 27.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161479543 P | US201161479540P | 27.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161479540 P | [2014/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012149367 | Date: | 01.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2701482 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2701482 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01C7/20 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
A01C7/205 (EP,US);
A01B63/008 (US);
A01B49/04 (US);
A01B49/06 (US);
A01B71/02 (US);
A01B76/00 (US);
A01B79/005 (US);
A01C21/00 (US);
A01C5/062 (US);
A01C5/064 (US);
A01C7/203 (US);
Y10S111/90 (EP,US);
Y10S111/903 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/16] | A01C7/20, // A01C5/06 | ||
Former IPC [2014/10] | A01C5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR EINSTELLUNG EINER ABWÄRTS UND/ODER AUFWÄRTS WIRKENDEN KRAFT | [2014/10] | English: | DOWN AND/OR UP FORCE ADJUSTMENT SYSTEM | [2014/10] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AJUSTEMENT DE FORCE VERS LE BAS ET/OU VERS LE HAUT | [2014/10] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/10] | 28.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.04.2012 | AL | 06.06.2018 | AT | 06.06.2018 | CY | 06.06.2018 | CZ | 06.06.2018 | DK | 06.06.2018 | EE | 06.06.2018 | ES | 06.06.2018 | FI | 06.06.2018 | HR | 06.06.2018 | LT | 06.06.2018 | LV | 06.06.2018 | MC | 06.06.2018 | MK | 06.06.2018 | MT | 06.06.2018 | NL | 06.06.2018 | PL | 06.06.2018 | RO | 06.06.2018 | RS | 06.06.2018 | SI | 06.06.2018 | SK | 06.06.2018 | SM | 06.06.2018 | TR | 06.06.2018 | BG | 06.09.2018 | GR | 07.09.2018 | IS | 06.10.2018 | PT | 08.10.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 27.04.2012 | |
AL | 06.06.2018 | ||
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
MT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 27.04.2012 | |
AL | 06.06.2018 | ||
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2091073 (MASSEY FERGUSON PERKINS LTD) [X] 1-3,10 * figures 1,2 * * page 2, lines 17-47,54-68,97-102 * * page 3, lines 5-14,34-43 * [Y] 4-9; | [A]GB2126062 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H) [A] 1,3-5,7,10-12,14-16 * figures 1-4 * * page 2, line 72 - page 3, line 11 * * page 3, lines 32-96 *; | [IY]DE8412142U (AMAZONEN-WERKE H. DREYER [DE]) [I] 1-5,10-15 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 2 * [Y] 4-9,11-16; | [A]US4766962 (FRASE ROLAND J [US]) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 13 * * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 44 *; | [XY]US5163518 (FOLEY DANIEL M [US]) [X] 1,3,10 * figures 1-4 * * column 2, lines 55-66 * * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 45 * [Y] 4-9; | [Y]US6386128 (SVOBODA JOHN M [US], et al) [Y] 9 * figure 2 * * column 5, lines 26-35 *; | [YA]US6389999 (DUELLO DENNIS [US]) [Y] 4-8,11-16 * figures 7-9; claim 1 * * column 3, lines 15-25,57-61 * * column 4, lines 29-36,46-58 * * column 6, lines 20-49 * * column 8, lines 2-8 * [A] 1; | [E]EP2503869 (CNH IND BELGIUM NV [BE]) [E] 1-3,10 * figures 1-6 ** paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0016] - [0020] - [0022] - [0024] * | International search | [Y]GB2126062 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H); | [Y]US6389999 (DUELLO DENNIS [US]); | [Y]US7316189 (FOUNTAIN CHRISTOPHER GEORGE [GB], et al) |