EP2719690 - AMIDE COMPOUND AND PHARMACEUTICAL APPLICATION THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 2-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 2-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEBA, Takaki c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1 Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1125 / JP | 02 /
MAEDA, Katsuya c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1 Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1125 / JP | 03 /
KOTOKU, Masayuki c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1 Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1125 / JP | 04 /
HIRATA, Kazuyuki c/o CentralPharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1 Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1125 / JP | 05 /
SEKI, Noriyoshi c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1 Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1125 / JP | 06 /
YAMANAKA, Hiroshi c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1 Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1125 / JP | 07 /
SAKAI, Takayuki c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1 Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 5691125 / JP | 08 /
HIRASHIMA, Shintaro c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1 Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1125 / JP | 09 /
OBIKA, Shingo c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1 Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1125 / JP | 10 /
SHIOZAKI, Makoto c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1 Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1125 / JP | 11 /
YOKOTA, Masahiro c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1 Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1125 / JP | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12776819.0 | 27.04.2012 | WO2012JP61352 | Priority number, date | JP20110100331 | 28.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011100331 | US201161482418P | 04.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161482418 P | [2014/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012147916 | Date: | 01.11.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2719690 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D249/04, A61K31/4192, A61K31/42, A61P1/00, A61P17/04, A61P19/02, A61P25/00, A61P37/02, A61P43/00, C07D261/08, C07D413/06 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
A61K31/4192 (EP,KR,US);
C07D249/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D261/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/42 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D413/06 (CN);
C07D417/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Extension states | BA | 27.11.2013 | ME | 27.11.2013 | Title | German: | AMIDVERBINDUNG UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2014/16] | English: | AMIDE COMPOUND AND PHARMACEUTICAL APPLICATION THEREFOR | [2014/16] | French: | COMPOSÉ D'AMIDE ET SON UTILISATION EN PHARMACIE | [2014/16] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2013 | Translation filed | 27.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 30.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/53] | 06.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/53] | Divisional application(s) | EP14199821.1 / EP2927217 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6100260 (NAKATSUKA MASASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-44 * column 1, line 12 - line 14; claims 1,8 *; | [A]EP2181710 (PHENEX PHARMACEUTICALS AG [DE]) [A] 1-44* paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0025]; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2010096170 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [A] 1-44 * Appendix A; paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0072]; claim 1 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0023] * | International search | [A]GB768840 (CASSELLA FARBWERKE MAINKUR AG); | [A]JPH0789951 (STERLING WINTHROP INC); | [A]WO9929674 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al); | [A] - MALONEY,P.R. ET AL., "Identification of a Chemical Tool for the Orphan Nuclear Receptor FXR", J. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 43, no. 16, pages 2971 - 4, XP002992679 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm0002127 | [A] - WANG,H. ET AL., "Stereoselective Synthesis of 2-Carbamoyl-2-cyanocyclopropanecarboxylates by Tandem Oxidative Cyclization and Neighboring Group-Assisted Decarboxylation", J. ORG.CHEM., (2010), vol. 75, no. 20, pages 6994 - 7, XP002992679 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm0002127 |