EP2702547 - ONLINE PAYMENT METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alibaba Group Holding Limited Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 Grand Cayman / KY | [2014/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIE, Qionglin C/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 10/F, Building A The West Lake International Plaza of S&T No. 391 Wen'er Road Hangzhou 310013 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Liang C/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 10/F, Building A The West Lake International Plaza of S&T No. 391 Wen'er Road Hangzhou 310013 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Renchen C/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 10/F, Building A The West Lake International Plaza of S&T No. 391 Wen'er Road Hangzhou 310013 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Yao C/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 10/F, Building A The West Lake International Plaza of S&T No. 391 Wen'er Road Hangzhou 310013 / CN | 05 /
WEI, Peng C/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 10/F, Building A The West Lake International Plaza of S&T No. 391 Wen'er Road Hangzhou 310013 / CN | 06 /
MA, Xiaolong C/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 10/F, Building A The West Lake International Plaza of S&T No. 391 Wen'er Road Hangzhou 310013 / CN | 07 /
WANG, Qun C/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 10/F, Building A The West Lake International Plaza of S&T No. 391 Wen'er Road Hangzhou 310013 / CN | [2014/21] |
Former [2014/10] | 01 /
NIE, Qionglin C/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 10/F, Building A The West Lake International Plaza of S&T No. 391 Wen'er Road Hangzhou 310013 / CN | ||
02 /
YANG, Liang C/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 10/F, Building A The West Lake International Plaza of S&T No. 391 Wen'er Road Hangzhou 310013 / CN | |||
03 /
HUANG, Renchen C/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 10/F, Building A The West Lake International Plaza of S&T No. 391 Wen'er Road Hangzhou 310013 / CN | |||
04 /
ZHANG, Yao C/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 10/F, Building A The West Lake International Plaza of S&T No. 391 Wen'er Road Hangzhou 310013 / CN | |||
05 /
WEI, Peng C/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 10/F, Building A The West Lake International Plaza of S&T No. 391 Wen'er Road Hangzhou 310013 / CN | |||
06 /
MA, Xiaolong C/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 10/F, Building A The West Lake International Plaza of S&T No. 391 Wen'er Road Hangzhou 310013 / CN | Representative(s) | Gosnall, Toby Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Wilson, Alan Stuart Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12776890.1 | 19.04.2012 | WO2012US34251 | Priority number, date | CN20111106712 | 27.04.2011 Original published format: CN201110106712 | [2014/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012148773 | Date: | 01.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2702547 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/06, // G06Q30/00 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
G06Q20/02 (EP,US);
G06Q20/12 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/10] | G06Q30/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/10] | Title | German: | ONLINE-BEZAHLVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2014/10] | English: | ONLINE PAYMENT METHOD AND DEVICE | [2014/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PAIEMENT EN LIGNE | [2014/10] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/10] | 19.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 02.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US6151588 (TOZZOLI GUY FREDERICK [US], et al); | [X]US2002161707 (COLE ALAN [US], et al); | [A]US2006004670 (MCKENNEY MARY K [US], et al); | [Y]US2007293202 (MOSHIR SEAN [US], et al); | [A] - SORKIN ET AL., "PAYMENT METHODS FOR CONSUMER-TO-CONSUMER ONLINE TRANSACTIONS", PAYMENT METHODS FOR CONSUMER-TO-CONSUMER ONLINE TRANSACTIONS, 35 AKRON L. REV., (20011201), URL: http://papers.ssrn.comlsol3/papers.cfm?abstractid=1057521, (20130213), XP055136098 |